Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Charles E. Thomas
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00388
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. All Matters in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)
September 2, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:20-cv-388-DCN (jp)
September 2, 2020 The 21 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jp)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Charles E. Thomas re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/28/2020. (jp)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Charles E. Thomas This is a sealed document.. (Jones, Mark)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - Complaint (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2085630.), filed by Charles E. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jones, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles E. Thomas
Represented By: Mark B Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?