Morris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karen Marie Morris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00416
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Marie Morris. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed on Attorney General of USA, Department of Justice, #2 Summons Executed on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region X, SSA)(Chermol, David)
September 15, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:20-cv-416-DCN (alw)
September 15, 2020 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(alw)
September 15, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #10 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE was filed incorrectly in this case. DISREGARD(alw)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney David F Chermol for Karen Marie Morris Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David Chermol. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2096490.)Daniel Jacob Luker appearing for Plaintiff Karen Marie Morris. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (Luker, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. ((alw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Commissioner of Social Security, Karen Marie Morris re #1 Petition for Review,. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/14/2020. (alw)
August 24, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Petition for Review, attachment 1-2, filed by Karen Marie Morris was filed incorrectly in this case. The attachment has been sealed and refiled as document #2 .(alw)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Karen Marie Morris This is a sealed document.. (alw)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2092084.), filed by Karen Marie Morris. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Statement of Social Security Numbers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Luker, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Marie Morris
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Luker
Represented By: David F Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?