Crabb v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christina Alexandria Crabb
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00446
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Alexandria Crabb. Andrew Saul served on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Osterhout, Karl)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Eric Staples on behalf of Andrew Saul (Staples, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Andrew Saul (Rodriguez, Joanne)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS. Petitioners In Forma PauperisApplication (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. ((alw)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Christina Alexandria Crabb. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/13/2020. (alw)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (alw)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Christina Alexandria Crabb Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Social Security Number by Christina Alexandria Crabb This is a sealed document.. (Bybee, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Karl E. Osterhout. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2103995.)Michael David Bybee appearing for Plaintiff Christina Alexandria Crabb. Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Bybee, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Michael David Bybee appearing for Plaintiff Christina Alexandria Crabb. Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Bybee, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Christina Alexandria Crabb. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bybee, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabb v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Alexandria Crabb
Represented By: Michael David Bybee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?