Kile v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Janice Elaine Kile
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00456
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA by Petitioner Janice Elaine Kile re #1 Petition for Review amended date to show correct month the document was signed. (Jones, Mark)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Janice Elaine Kile re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/20/2020. (alw)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (alw)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 First APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Mark B Jones appearing for Petitioner Janice Elaine Kile. Responses due by 10/19/2020 (Jones, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Janice Elaine Kile This is a sealed document.. (Jones, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - Complaint, filed by Janice Elaine Kile. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kile v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Janice Elaine Kile
Represented By: Mark B Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?