McHugh v Vertical Partners West
Plaintiff: Connie McHugh and Gilbert Fallen
Defendant: Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. and Vertical Partners West, LLC d/b/a Venom Group International
Case Number: 2:2020cv00581
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 78 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (kt)
March 1, 2021 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/2/2021.(Duke, Keely)
February 18, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Susan M Valinis; Tracey McDevitt Hagan and Molly C Reilly terminated. Request to Turn Electronic Noticing OFF (no longer receive NEFs in this case only) by Attorney (Laird, Cory)
February 16, 2021 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re #71 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Vertical Partners West, LLC. Replies due by 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DEFENDANT VERTICAL PARTNERS WEST, LLCS DECLARATION OF COUNSEL)(Laird, Cory)
February 14, 2021 Filing 74 Sealed Document Re: #72 Response to Motion. (Neill, Tyler)
February 14, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION to Seal Document #72 Response to Motion Tyler Harrison Neill appearing for Plaintiffs Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. Responses due by 3/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Neill, Tyler)
February 14, 2021 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re #71 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. Replies due by 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Neill, Tyler)
January 26, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Keely E. Duke appearing for Cross Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd., Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Duke, Keely)
January 13, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory Russell Laird on behalf of Vertical Partners West, LLC (Laird, Cory)
January 6, 2021 Filing 69 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Stipulation (Dkt. 66) is GRANTED. Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD. a/k/a/ Zhangshan Electric Win Technology Co., LTD shall file an answer or other appropriate responsive pleading on or before January 26, 2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
January 5, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jesse M. Cohen. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2148592.)Tyler Harrison Neill appearing for Plaintiffs Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. Responses due by 1/26/2021 (Neill, Tyler)
January 5, 2021 Filing 66 STIPULATION re Set Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd.. (Duke, Keely)
December 30, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh, Vertical Partners West, LLC, Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. re #61 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/1/2021. (jp)
December 29, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Harrison Neill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neill, Tyler)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT YUNTONG POWER CO. LTD'S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. #62 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD. a/k/a/ Zhangshan Electric Win Technology Co., LTD shall file an answer or other appropriate responsive pleading on or before 1/5/21. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 28, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. answer due 1/5/2021. (jp)
December 23, 2020 All out-of-state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission e) Pro Hac Vice/ Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants. (jp)
December 22, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Expedite For Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Keely E. Duke appearing for Cross Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd., Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 1/12/2021 (Duke, Keely)
December 22, 2020 Filing 61 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-01012. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. The motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Yuntong Power Co. Ltd. (Doc. 43) is DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs motion to transfer (Doc. 47) is GRANTED. 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Idaho. 4. Upon effectuating the transfer, the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/8/2020. (ve)
December 8, 2020 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh, #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/8/2020. (ve)
November 9, 2020 Filing 57 TEXT ORDER - AND NOW, on this 9th day of November, 2020, IT IS ORDERED THAT a telephone status conference is scheduled for November 12, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call when all parties are on the line to chambers at (717) 221-3970. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/9/2020. (ve)
November 6, 2020 Filing 56 Letter from All Counsel requesting Brief Status Conference . (Cohen, Jesse)
October 7, 2020 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #54 Brief in Opposition by Michael J. Boccella on behalf of Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. (Boccella, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Filing 54 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case Amended filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Voter, Warren)
October 5, 2020 Filing 53 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd..(Voter, Warren)
October 1, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY BRIEF re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(2) filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd..(Voter, Warren)
September 30, 2020 Filing 51 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with COS filed by Vertical Partners West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Reilly, Molly)
September 30, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY BRIEF re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Proposed Order and COS filed by Vertical Partners West, LLC.(Reilly, Molly)
September 30, 2020 Filing 49 REPLY BRIEF re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(2) filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd..(Voter, Warren)
September 23, 2020 Filing 48 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Cohen, Jesse)
September 23, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Transfer Case by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C)(Cohen, Jesse)
September 23, 2020 Filing 46 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C)(Cohen, Jesse)
September 21, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse M. Cohen on behalf of Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh (Cohen, Jesse)
September 14, 2020 Filing 44 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd..(Voter, Warren)
September 11, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Proposed Order)(Voter, Warren)
September 10, 2020 Filing 42 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 9/10/2020. (ve)
September 9, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT by Vertical Partners West, LLC. (Reilly, Molly)
June 25, 2020 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Documents under Hague Convention served on Defendant Yuntong Power Co., Ltd. a.k.a Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. on 10/21/2019, filed by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Cohen, Jesse)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Yuntong Power Co., LTD a/k/a Zhangshan Electric Win Technology Co., LTDs (Yuntong) motion to dismiss, Doc. 27, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties have ninety days to conduct discovery limited to the issue of whether this court has personal jurisdiction over Defendant Yuntong. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 6/1/2020. (ve)
June 1, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(2) filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 6/1/2020. (ve)
May 18, 2020 Filing 37 . (Cohen, Jesse)
December 10, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY BRIEF re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(2) BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd..(Voter, Warren)
December 9, 2019 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd.. (Voter, Warren)
December 6, 2019 Filing 34 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(2) filed by Vertical Partners West, LLC.(Reilly, Molly)
December 3, 2019 Filing 33 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(2) filed by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jesse)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Judge Malachy E Mannion - - Case Reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. Honorable Malachy E Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (jw)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER LIFTING STAY On December 13, 2018 this court granted the plaintiffs motion to stay pending the overseas service of defendant Yuntong Power Co., LTD a/k/a Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., LTD. (Doc. 17). Recently these same defendants filed a motion to dismiss. (Doc. 27). Since it is apparent that this defendant has been properly served the STAY is Lifted.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/21/19. (bs)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File respons to deft. Yuntong Power Co's mot. to dismiss. Resp. due 12/6/19.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/14/19 (bs)
November 14, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTDs Motion to Dismiss by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jesse)
November 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Boccella on behalf of Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. (Boccella, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Its Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(2) filed by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd..(Voter, Warren)
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(2) by Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s) A)(Voter, Warren)
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Molly Reilly.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/22/19. (bs)
October 21, 2019 Filing 25 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Molly C Reilly on behalf of Vertical Partners West, LLC Attorney Molly Reilly is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4904019., filed by on behalf of Vertical Partners West, LLC.(Reilly, Molly)
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Nicole Jensen terminated on behalf of Vertical Partners West, LLC. (Jensen, Nicole)
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey McDevitt Hagan on behalf of Vertical Partners West, LLC (Hagan, Tracey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Overseas Service of Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., LTD filed by Vertical Partners West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F)(Jensen, Nicole)
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT and Brief in support of this Honorable Court entering Default Judgment against Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., LTD by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Affidavit of Celeste Ingalls)(Cohen, Jesse)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER:On or before August 12, 2019, the plaintiffs counsel is to provide the court with an updated status as to service of this matter upon Yuntong Power Co., Ltd.(2)At that time, if no certificate has been received from the Chinese Central Authority with respect to this matter, the parties are to brief the issue of whether the entry of default and/or default judgment would be appropriate pursuant to Article 15 of the Hague Convention. Status Report due by 8/12/2019.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/6/19. (bs)
April 29, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service Upon Defendant Yuntong Power Co., LTD by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Cohen, Jesse)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs counsel shall e-file a written status report regarding serviceupon defendant Yuntong Power Co., LTD. Status report due on or before May 1, 2019. Status Report due by 5/1/2019.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/22/19. (bs)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Stay case.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/13/18 (bs)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Overseas Service of Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., LTD filed by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh.(Cohen, Jesse)
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Overseas Service of Defendant Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., LTD by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Affidavit of Celeste Ingalls, #2 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jesse)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet, #2 285) (bg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 Praecipe to Issue Summons to Defendant Yuntong. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant Yuntong)(Cohen, Jesse)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vertical Partners West, LLC. (Jensen, Nicole)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd. by Vertical Partners West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Jensen, Nicole)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vertical Partners West, LLC, Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd., filed by Connie McHugh, Gilbert Fallen.(Cohen, Jesse)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by pltf. by 9/20/18, by deft. by 10/20/2018. Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 3/20/2019. Defendant Expert Report is due by 4/20/2019. Supplemental due by 5/1/2019. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 6/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/20/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/5/18. (bs)
June 25, 2018 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Gilbert Fallen, Connie McHugh. (Cohen, Jesse)
June 15, 2018 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Susan Valinis.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/15/18. (bs)
June 8, 2018 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Susan M Valinis on behalf of Vertical Partners West, LLC Attorney Susan Valinis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4450701.. (Valinis, Susan)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2018 10:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.This conference will be held by telephone but may be held in- person if counsel requests and has the concurrence of all other counsel. Counsel are advised to comply with Local Rule 16.3 of the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Local Rule 16.3(a) requires lead counsel for each party to confer at least fourteen (14) days prior to the initial case management conference. Where the case management plan requests dates, counsel should agree upon a specific month, day and year. (Please do not make entries such as 28 days after the close of discovery).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/7/18. (bs)
June 6, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Vertical Partners West, LLC. (Jensen, Nicole)
June 6, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Vertical Partners West, LLC.(Jensen, Nicole)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/17/18. (bs)
May 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vertical Partners West, LLC from Superior Court of Pennsylvania, case number 18-1041. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4426615), filed by Vertical Partners West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Certificate)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHugh v Vertical Partners West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie McHugh
Represented By: Jesse M. Cohen
Represented By: Tyler Harrison Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Fallen
Represented By: Jesse M. Cohen
Represented By: Tyler Harrison Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuntong Power Co. LTD a.k.a. Zhongshan Electric Win Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Boccella
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Represented By: Warren E. Voter
Represented By: Taylor L Bruun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertical Partners West, LLC d/b/a Venom Group International
Represented By: Susan M Valinis
Represented By: Tracey McDevitt Hagan
Represented By: Nicole Jensen
Represented By: Molly C Reilly
Represented By: Cory Russell Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?