Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. United States Forest Service, et al.
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Defendant: IPNF ACT. SUPERVISOR KIMBERLY PIERSON, Forest Service, US, United States Forest Service and Kimberly Pierson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00244
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kimberly Pierson, United States Forest Service for proceedings held on July 12, 2021 before Judge Winmill.. (Hamilton, Emma)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED. The Hanna Flats Project is SUSPENDED until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B. Lynn Winmill: Video Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2021 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. Order forthcoming. (ESR: Sunny Trumbull.) Audio File saved via zoom. (st)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ERRATA by Defendants Kimberly Pierson, United States Forest Service re #10 Response to Motion, . (Tustin, John)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Smith, Rebecca)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Kimberly Pierson, United States Forest Service Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Karl Dekome, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hanna Flats Administrative Record Index)(Tustin, John) Modified on 6/24/2021, 2 USB drives received of administrative record and maintained in the clerk's office file room. (jd).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kimberly Pierson, United States Forest Service. Replies due by 7/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Felipe Cano, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Shannon E. Brinkman, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jon Songster)(Tustin, John)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Defendants response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order is due by June 24, 2021; Plaintiffs reply in support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order is due by July 1,2021; A video hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order is set for July 12, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. mountain time. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Responses due by 6/24/2021 Replies due by 7/1/2021. Video Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2021 04:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (lm)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Alliance for the Wild Rockies and counsel for Kimberly Pierson and United States Forest Service re #1 Complaint and #4 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/9/2021. (jd)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma L. Hamilton on behalf of All Defendants (Hamilton, Emma)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Joint Stipulation for Briefing Schedule by Kimberly Pierson, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit text of proposed order)(Tustin, John)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Tustin on behalf of All Defendants (Tustin, John)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 6/29/2021)Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiff Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Affidavit)(Smith, Rebecca)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for Chief, #2 Summons for Civil Process Clerk, #3 Summons for Kimberly Pierson)(jd)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2226539.), filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Cover Sheet)(Smith, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. United States Forest Service, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPNF ACT. SUPERVISOR KIMBERLY PIERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Service, US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Emma L. Hamilton
Represented By: John P Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Pierson
Represented By: Emma L. Hamilton
Represented By: John P Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?