Jamestown Forestlands, LLC v. Horton et al
Plaintiff: Jamestown Forestlands, LLC
Defendant: Kathryn Horton and Guy Horton
3Rd Party Defendant: The Molpus Woodlands Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00273
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guy Horton, Kathryn Horton. The Molpus Woodlands Group, LLC served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (McLaughlin, Daniel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 20 The Molpus Woodlands Group, LLC's ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by The Molpus Woodlands Group, LLC.(Johnson, Marcus)
October 27, 2021 Filing 19 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/8/2021 at 11:00 AM (Mountain Time) before Judge B Lynn Winmill. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9145 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. (jlg)
October 26, 2021 Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Per reassignment of this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/27/2021 02:00 PM MT, 01:00 PM PT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale is hereby VACATED. (at)
October 26, 2021 Filing 17 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (kt)
October 26, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:21-CV-273-BLW. (kt)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 Jamestown Forestlands, LLC's ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Counterclaim by Jamestown Forestlands, LLC.(Johnson, Marcus)
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 DISCOVERY PLAN by Jamestown Forestlands, LLC Joint Discovery Plan. (Johnson, Marcus)
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Guy Horton, Kathryn Horton. (McLaughlin, Daniel)
October 13, 2021 Filing 13 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/14/2021 10:30 AM MT, 09:30 AM PT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 10/27/2021 02:00 PM MT, 01:00 PM PT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale. All parties shall use the Court's AT&T teleconferencing line to connect to this hearing, by dialing: 1-888-273-3658, Access Code: 5475731, Security Code: 5637. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans are due on or before 10/20/2021. (at)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to The Molpus Woodlands Group, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (kt)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Trespass against The Molpus Woodlands Group, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM for Quiet Title, Declaratory Relief, and Trespass against Jamestown Forestlands, LLC by Guy Horton. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Molpus)(McLaughlin, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER withdrawing #3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal #8 filed by Defendants. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Guy Horton Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (McLaughlin, Daniel)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jamestown Forestlands, LLC. Replies due by 9/28/2021.(Marfice, Douglas)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jamestown Forestlands, LLC. Amendment to #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Affidavit of Service on Guy Horton, #6 Affidavit of Service on Kathryn Horton)(Marfice, Douglas) Modified on 9/9/2021 to correct docket caption(kt).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before October 7, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Guy Horton, Kathryn Horton, Jamestown Forestlands, LLC re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/25/2021. (kt)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Daniel Toby McLaughlin appearing for Defendants Guy Horton, Kathryn Horton. Responses due by 9/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Decl of Toby McLaughlin ISO Motion to Dismiss - Pt 1, #3 Affidavit Decl of Toby McLaughlin ISO Motion to Dismiss - Pt 2)(McLaughlin, Daniel)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Guy Horton, Kathryn Horton. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Guy Horton)(kt)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jamestown Forestlands, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2236034.), filed by Jamestown Forestlands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Guy Horton, #7 Summons Kathryn Horton)(Marfice, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamestown Forestlands, LLC v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Horton
Represented By: Daniel Toby McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Horton
Represented By: Daniel Toby McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamestown Forestlands, LLC
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Marcus E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Molpus Woodlands Group, LLC
Represented By: Marcus E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?