Rushing et al v. Kochava, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amanda Rushing, Ashley Supernault, Julie Remold and Ted Poon
Defendant: Kochava, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00322
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #14 Litigation Order, re: Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines and Request for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Kochava, Inc.. (Mariam, Craig)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2021 04:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B Lynn Winmill. On or before October 20, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kochava, Inc.. (Mariam, Craig)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Due to reassignment of this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/14/2021 11:00 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale is hereby VACATED. (at)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(kt)
September 21, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:21-cv-00322-BLW (kt)
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Douglas I. Cuthbertson appearing for Plaintiffs Ted Poon, Julie Remold, Amanda Rushing, Ashley Supernault. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Declaration ISO of Preliminary Approval, #4 Exhibits A-F, #5 Exhibits G-P, #6 Exhibits Q-Z, #7 Exhibits AA-DD, #8 Angeion Declaration ISO preliminary approval)(Cuthbertson, Douglas)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kochava, Inc., Ted Poon, Julie Remold, Amanda Rushing, Ashley Supernault re #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/2/2021. (kt)
September 3, 2021 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kt)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Joel Mariam on behalf of Kochava, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mariam, Craig)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before October 7, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amanda Rushing, Julie Remold, Ted Poon, Ashley Supernault. Kochava, Inc. waiver sent on 8/10/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Cuthbertson, Douglas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 Docket Entry Order Approving #2 and #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Douglas I. Cuthbertson and Hank Bates for Ted Poon, Julie Remold, Amanda Rushing and Ashley Supernault Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kochava, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (lm)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Hank Bates. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2255230.)Brook Bernard Bond appearing for Plaintiffs Ted Poon, Julie Remold, Amanda Rushing, Ashley Supernault. Responses due by 8/30/2021 (Bond, Brook)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Douglas I. Cuthbertson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2255224.)Brook Bernard Bond appearing for Plaintiffs Ted Poon, Julie Remold, Amanda Rushing, Ashley Supernault. Responses due by 8/30/2021 (Bond, Brook)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Kochava, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2255196.), filed by Amanda Rushing, Julie Remold, Ted Poon, Ashley Supernault. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2012 Chart, #2 Exhibit B - 2017 Chart, #3 Summons, #4 Cover Sheet)(Bond, Brook)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing et al v. Kochava, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Rushing
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Represented By: Douglas I. Cuthbertson
Represented By: Hank Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Supernault
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Represented By: Douglas I. Cuthbertson
Represented By: Hank Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Remold
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Represented By: Douglas I. Cuthbertson
Represented By: Hank Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Poon
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Represented By: Douglas I. Cuthbertson
Represented By: Hank Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kochava, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Joel Mariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?