Luettgerodt v. State of Idaho et al
Plaintiff: Charles A. Luettgerodt
Defendant: State of Idaho and Lansing L Haynes
Case Number: 2:2021cv00383
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Charles A. Luettgerodt and counsel for Lansing L Haynes and State of Idaho re #1 Complaint, #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/18/2022. (kt)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement (kt)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Approval of legal intern, Aaron G. Eskue, to appear before the Court under the supervision of attorneys Steven L. Olsen and Leslie M. Hayes. Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 83.4(g). The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -For Approval to Appear Leslie Marie Hayes appearing for Defendants Lansing L Haynes, State of Idaho. Responses due by 12/9/2021 (Hayes, Leslie)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Leslie Marie Hayes appearing for Defendants Lansing L Haynes, State of Idaho. Responses due by 12/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hayes, Leslie)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Marie Hayes on behalf of Lansing L Haynes, State of Idaho (Hayes, Leslie)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/23/2021 11:30 AM MT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 1/6/2022 01:30 PM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale. All parties shall use the Court's Zoom teleconferencing line to connect to this hearing, by dialing: 1-669-254-5252, Meeting ID: 161 5442 0149, Passcode: 787003. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 12/30/2021. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (at))
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/23/2021 11:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before November 16, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
September 22, 2021 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 1556 (kt)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lansing L Haynes, State of Idaho, filed by Charles A. Luettgerodt. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luettgerodt v. State of Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Luettgerodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing L Haynes
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?