Composite Resources, Inc. v. Rood
Plaintiff: COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC and JOHN CALEB ROOD, JR.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00500
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving (Dkt. #9 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney William Klett for COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
February 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by William Y. Klett, III. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2339715.)Mark O Morris appearing for Plaintiff COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. Responses due by 2/22/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morris, Mark)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 Docket Entry Order Approving (Dkt. #7 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Sid Leach for COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Sid Leach. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2338648.)Mark O Morris appearing for Plaintiff COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. Responses due by 2/22/2022 (Morris, Mark)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER PERMITTING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE - The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Authorization of Alternative Service of Process (Dkt. #5 ) as follows: Plaintiff shall effectuate service of process upon Defendant by publication under Idaho law as proposed in the motion. Plaintiff shall also carry out service of process upon Defendant under Nevada law, by serving the summons and complaint on the counsel who represent Defendants company before the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada identified as case number 21-14382-nmc. If Plaintiff chooses, he may file a copy of summons complaint on the docket of the bankruptcy proceeding, but need not do so to effect service. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT and Ex Parte Motion for Authorization of Alternative Service of Process by COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark O. Morris, #2 Exhibit Form of Order)(Morris, Mark)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. (Morris, Mark)
December 21, 2021 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lm)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)7,842,067, 7,892,253, 8,888,807 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lm)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JOHN CALEB ROOD, JR. USM 285 Sent to USM (Print attached Summons for service.) (lm)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN CALEB ROOD, JR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2318742.), filed by COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Supplement Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Morris, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Composite Resources, Inc. v. Rood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMPOSITE RESOURCES INC
Represented By: MARK O. MORRIS
Represented By: Mark O Morris
Represented By: Sid Leach
Represented By: William Young Klett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CALEB ROOD, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?