United States of America v. Gerke et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Billie Jean Gerke, Michael Jean Spear and Twin Cedars Camping and Vacation Rentals, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00439
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Trespass on Public Land
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Twin Cedars Camping and Vacation Rentals, LLC served on 12/3/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Firpo, Robert)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Billie Jean Gerke served on 12/3/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Firpo, Robert)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Billie Jean Gerke re: #4 Notice of Availability Setting Deadline, filed by Twin Cedars Camping and Vacation Rentals, LLC, Billie Jean Gerke, Michael Jean Spear, United States of America (alw)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Twin Cedars Camping and Vacation Rentals, LLC served on 10/30/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Firpo, Robert)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Michael Jean Spear served on 10/30/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Firpo, Robert)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Billie Jean Gerke served on 10/30/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Firpo, Robert)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Billie Jean Gerke, Michael Jean Spear, Twin Cedars Camping and Vacation Rentals, LLC, and counsel for United States of America re #3 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/17/2023. (jd)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of due process rights by Billie Jean Gerke, Michael Jean Spear, Twin Cedars Camping and Vacation Rentals, LLC (Received a large amount of filings and is maintained in the clerks' office file room.) (jd)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Billie Jean Gerke, Michael Jean Spear, Twin Cedars Camping and Vacation Rentals, LLC, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Summons Spear, #16 Summons Gerke, #17 Summons Twin Cedars LLC, #18 Cover Sheet)(Firpo, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gerke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Burke Firpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Jean Gerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jean Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Cedars Camping and Vacation Rentals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?