Murphy v. Kochava, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cindy Murphy, Scott Connelly, Jenny Watson and Adriana Ingram
Defendant: Kochava, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00058
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as follows: Plaintiffs' claims for injunctive relief are DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiffs' claims under the Washington Consumer Protection Act (WCPA) and California's Unfair Competition Law (UCL) are DISMISSED with leave to amend. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) is DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend in accordance with this Order. Any such amendment shall be filed within 30 days after issuance of this Order. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kochava, Inc. re #19 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Mariam, Craig)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Kochava, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/8/2023.(Mariam, Craig)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Scott Connelly, Adriana Ingram, Cindy Murphy, Jenny Watson. Replies due by 6/7/2023.(Ellingsen, Mark)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Having reviewed the parties' stipulation (Dkt. #16 ) and good cause appearing, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) by May 25, 2023. Defendants reply shall be filed 14 days after the response. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (hgp)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Scott Connelly, Adriana Ingram, Cindy Murphy, Jenny Watson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellingsen, Mark)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Plaintiffs' response deadline as to motion to dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) for 5/25/2023. (hgp)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Because Plaintiffs filed an Amended Complaint (Dkt. 13) and Defendant filed a second (Dkt. 14) Motion to Dismiss, Defendant's first (Dkt. 9) Motion to Dismiss is denied as MOOT. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mhw))
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing ( Responses due by 5/11/2023)Craig Joel Mariam appearing for Defendant Kochava, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Kochava's Motion to Dismiss FAC)(Mariam, Craig)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kochava, Inc., filed by Cindy Murphy, Scott Connelly, Jenny Watson, Adriana Ingram.(Ellingsen, Mark)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge B Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:23-cv-58-BLW (alw)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Kochava, Inc. of Related Cases (Mariam, Craig)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kochava, Inc.. (Mariam, Craig)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Craig Joel Mariam appearing for Defendant Kochava, Inc.. Responses due by 4/7/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Kochava's Motion to Dismiss)(Mariam, Craig)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #6 #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Michael T Houchin,Ronald A Marron for Cindy Murphy Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE for Ronald Marron ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2538023.)( Responses due by 4/5/2023)Mark A Ellingsen appearing for Plaintiff Cindy Murphy. (Ellingsen, Mark) Modified on 3/15/2023 to edit docket text (alw).
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael T. Houchin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2538016.)Mark A Ellingsen appearing for Plaintiff Cindy Murphy. Responses due by 4/5/2023 (Ellingsen, Mark)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER adopting #4 Stipulation to Extend time to Respond. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Kochava, Inc.. (Mariam, Craig)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cindy Murphy re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (Ellingsen, Mark)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kochava, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kochava, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2515250.), filed by Cindy Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Ellingsen, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Kochava, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Murphy
Represented By: Mark A Ellingsen
Represented By: Ronald A Marron
Represented By: Michael T Houchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Connelly
Represented By: Mark A Ellingsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Watson
Represented By: Mark A Ellingsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Ingram
Represented By: Mark A Ellingsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kochava, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Joel Mariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?