Safeco Insurance Company of America, et al. v. Russell, et al.
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America and Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Defendant: Mary Russell, Antelope Mountain Resort, LLC, Brittney Cornwell, Tamber Spears, Christine Wagner, Shannon Flaget Hall, James D Russell and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2023cv00238
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Amanda K Brailsford
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on 7/24/2023 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Amanda K Brailsford. On or before July 17, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
June 20, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holding Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Safeco Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Guadagno, Michael)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Safeco Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Guadagno, Michael)
June 12, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Brittney Cornwell, Shannon Flaget Hall, Tamber Spears, Christine Wagner.(Archer, Max)
June 6, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Christine Wagner served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Guadagno, Michael)
June 1, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Brittney Cornwell served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023; Shannon Flaget Hall served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Guadagno, Michael)
June 1, 2023 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE AND NOTICE OF CASE NUMBER CHANGE. Due to the appointment of United States District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford. Judge David C. Nye is no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:23-cv-00238-AKB. (jd)
May 31, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Antelope Mountain Resort, LLC served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Guadagno, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Mary Russell served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Guadagno, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Tamber Spears served on 5/13/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Guadagno, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeco Insurance Company of America. James D Russell served on 5/19/2023, answer due 6/9/2023. (Guadagno, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for re #3 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint,,, #4 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/31/2023. (hs)
May 31, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (hs)
May 30, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Antelope Mountain Resort, LLC. (Fannin, Patrick)
May 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick K Fannin on behalf of Antelope Mountain Resort, LLC (Fannin, Patrick)
May 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick K Fannin on behalf of Mary Russell (Fannin, Patrick)
May 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Max K Archer on behalf of Brittney Cornwell, Shannon Flaget Hall, Tamber Spears, Christine Wagner (Archer, Max)
May 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Antelope Mountain Resort, LLC, Brittney Cornwell, Shannon Flaget Hall, James D Russell, Mary Russell, Tamber Spears, Christine Wagner. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for Cornwell, #2 Summons for James Russell, #3 Summons for Mary Russell, #4 Summons for Flaget-Hall, #5 Summons for Spears, #6 Summons for Wagner)(jd)
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2563418.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Summons Antelope Mountain Resort, #21 Summons Brittney Cornwell, #22 Summons Christine Wagner, #23 Summons James D. Russell, #24 Summons Marry Russell, #25 Summons Shannon Flaget Hall, #26 Summons Tamber Spears)(Guadagno, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America, et al. v. Russell, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Russell
Represented By: Patrick K Fannin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antelope Mountain Resort, LLC
Represented By: Patrick K Fannin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney Cornwell
Represented By: Max K Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamber Spears
Represented By: Max K Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Wagner
Represented By: Max K Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Flaget Hall
Represented By: Max K Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?