Pitt, et al. v. Seltice Storage, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Andrew Pitt and Trevor Holland
Defendant: Seltice Storage, LLC, KJ Watercraft Leasing, Inc., Prather Enterprises, Inc., Kevin Prather, Kerry Prather and Alyssa Prather
Case Number: 2:2023cv00441
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Gerald Kobluk for Prather Enterprises, Inc. added. Attorney Patrick W Harwood terminated. Request to Leave Noticing ON for this case by Attorney (Kobluk, Gerald)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Kobluk on behalf of Alyssa Prather, Kerry Prather, Kevin Prather (Kobluk, Gerald)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (lm)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Explanation of Filing of Amended Complaint)(Pitt, Andrew)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Trevor Holland, KJ Watercraft Leasing, Inc., Andrew Pitt, Alyssa Prather, Kerry Prather, Kevin Prather, Prather Enterprises, Inc., Seltice Storage, LLC re #8 Notice of Appearance, #10 Notice of Appearance, #9 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, #7 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/22/2024. (lm)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seltice Storage, LLC. (Harwood, Patrick)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prather Enterprises, Inc.. (Harwood, Patrick)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KJ Watercraft Leasing, Inc.. (Harwood, Patrick)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W Harwood on behalf of Seltice Storage, LLC (Harwood, Patrick)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W Harwood on behalf of KJ Watercraft Leasing, Inc. (Harwood, Patrick)
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W Harwood on behalf of Prather Enterprises, Inc. (Harwood, Patrick)
November 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W Harwood on behalf of Alyssa Prather, Kerry Prather, Kevin Prather (Harwood, Patrick)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Seltice Storage LLC, KJ Watercraft Leasing, Inc; Prather Enterprises, Inc.; Kevin Prather; Kerry Prather & Alyssa Prather on 11-6-23, filed by Andrew Pitt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service of Seltice Storage LLC, #2 Affidavit Proof Service of KJ Watercraft Leasing LLC, #3 Affidavit Proof of Service of Prather Enterprises, #4 Affidavit Proof of Service of Kevin Prather, #5 Affidavit Proof of Service of Kerry Prather, #6 Affidavit Proof of Service of Alyssa Prather)(Pitt, Andrew)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC CASE FILING SYSTEM - Based on the foregoing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Andrew Pitts ex parte Motion for Access to Electronic Case Filing System (Dkt. 4 ) is GRANTED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
October 17, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Prather Enterprises, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (lm)
October 10, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KJ Watercraft Leasing, Inc., Alyssa Prather, Kerry Prather, Kevin Prather, Seltice Storage, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2023: #2 Cover Letter) (jd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2023: #3 Envelope) (jd).
October 10, 2023 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 402.00, receipt # 50338. (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitt, et al. v. Seltice Storage, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pitt
Represented By: Andrew Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Holland
Represented By: Andrew Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seltice Storage, LLC
Represented By: Patrick W Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KJ Watercraft Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick W Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prather Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald Kobluk
Represented By: Patrick W Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Prather
Represented By: Patrick W Harwood
Represented By: Gerald Kobluk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Prather
Represented By: Patrick W Harwood
Represented By: Gerald Kobluk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Prather
Represented By: Patrick W Harwood
Represented By: Gerald Kobluk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?