Elemental Research Inc. v. Brunson
Plaintiff: Elemental Research Inc.
Defendant: Jason Brunson
Case Number: 2:2024cv00128
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Amanda K Brailsford
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2024 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jason Brunson.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/3/2024.(Beaumont, Stacey)
April 19, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elemental Research Inc.. Replies due by 5/3/2024.(Huston, Joseph)
April 19, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason Brunson, filed by Elemental Research Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Huston, Joseph)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elemental Research Inc.. (Huston, Joseph)
April 1, 2024 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Scott Browdy for Jason Brunson. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jason Brunson, Elemental Research Inc. re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #1 Notice of Removal Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/31/2024. (hs)
April 1, 2024 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (hs)
March 29, 2024 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Stacey Beaumont appearing for Defendant Jason Brunson. Responses due by 4/19/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Beaumont, Stacey)
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Scott Browdy. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2729382.)Stacey Beaumont appearing for Defendant Jason Brunson. Responses due by 4/19/2024 (Beaumont, Stacey)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Jason Brunson re #1 Notice of Removal, Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal Exhibits,, . (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit B)(Beaumont, Stacey)
March 6, 2024 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal filed by Jason Brunson was filed incorrectly in this case. The required State Court documents have not been included. Each one should be a separate attachment, and each attachment should be specifically described [i.e. State Court Complaint, State Court Docket, Service Documents] Example: Your Main Document will be the Petition for Removal. State Court documents should be attached as: Attachment 1] Complaint Attachment 2] State Court Docket Attachment 3] Service Documents Attachment 4] Any answers Attachment 5] Pending Motions. The filing party shall re-submit all of the state court exhibits ONLY using the ECF event supplement.(hs)
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jason Brunson from First Judicial District of Idaho, case number CV28-24-0891.(Filing fee $405 receipt numberAIDDC-2715577.), filed by Jason Brunson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Beaumont, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elemental Research Inc. v. Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elemental Research Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Gordon Huston, III
Represented By: Susan P Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Brunson
Represented By: Brad P Miller
Represented By: Stacey Beaumont
Represented By: Scott Browdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?