Rogers v. Washington State University

Plaintiff: Tony L Rogers
Defendant: Washington State University
Case Number: 3:2018cv00475
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 Defendant Washington State University's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Washington State University.(Garcia, M)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Amy C Clemmons for Washington State University. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amy C. Clemmons. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1811610.)M Kate Garcia appearing for Defendant Washington State University. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Garcia, M)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Tony L Rogers and counsel for Washington State University re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/13/2019. (jp)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony L Rogers. Washington State University served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (jp)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by M Kate Garcia on behalf of Washington State University (Garcia, M)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Washington State University Summons Issued, filed by Tony L Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Washington State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State University
Represented By: Amy C Clemmons
Represented By: M Kate Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony L Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?