Oakley, Inc. v. Grangeville Depot LLC et al

Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Defendant: Grangeville Depot LLC and Rajan Chahal
Case Number: 3:2018cv00502
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 1/29/2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial by Rajan Chahal, Grangeville Depot LLC.(Hally, Jonathan)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Rajan Chahal answer due 12/19/2018; Grangeville Depot LLC answer due 12/19/2018. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Rajan Chahal, Grangeville Depot LLC, Oakley, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #8 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/11/2019. (alw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed Extension until 12/19/2018 Kenneth J Pedersen appearing for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Pedersen, Kenneth)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rajan Chahal, Grangeville Depot LLC. (Hally, Jonathan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D Hally on behalf of All Defendants (Hally, Jonathan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc.. Rajan Chahal served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Pedersen, Kenneth)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc.. Grangeville Depot LLC served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Pedersen, Kenneth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent number(s) See attached complaint (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (alw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rajan Chahal. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Grangeville Depot LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oakley, Inc.. (Pedersen, Kenneth)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1810483.), filed by Oakley, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Grangeville Depot, #3 Summons Chahal, Rajan)(Pedersen, Kenneth) Modified on 12/4/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley, Inc. v. Grangeville Depot LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grangeville Depot LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D Hally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajan Chahal
Represented By: Jonathan D Hally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth J Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?