Hill et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Leah Hill and M Todd Hill
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00559
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER (Standard Track) - Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 4/26/2019. Completion of Fact Discovery due by 10/14/2019. ADR/Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference shall be held by 10/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2019 10:00 AM (Mountain Time) in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald E. Bush: Scheduling Conference held on 2/12/2019. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter/ESR lcase.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 7. (lc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 DISCOVERY PLAN by FCA US LLC . (Johnson, Gregory)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Leah Hill, M Todd Hill. (Walsh, Bonner)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC for FCA US LLC.. (Johnson, Gregory)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2019 09:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Ronald E. Bush. On or before 2/5/19, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for FCA US LLC, Leah Hill, M Todd Hill re #1 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/11/2019. (jp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FCA US LLC.(Johnson, Gregory)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory S Johnson on behalf of FCA US LLC (Johnson, Gregory)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Hill, M Todd Hill. FCA US LLC served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Walsh, Bonner)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1825997.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Walsh, Bonner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Hill
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Todd Hill
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Gregory S Johnson
Represented By: Scott Christopher Cifrese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?