American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Nuxoll et al

Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Ronald Cramer, Glenn Cramer and Patrick J Nuxoll
Case Number: 3:2018cv00560
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Glenn Cramer, Ronald Cramer.(Seubert, Karin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Patrick J Nuxoll waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Riseborough, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Glenn Cramer waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Riseborough, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Ronald Cramer waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Riseborough, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT re Service of Process by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Riseborough, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Patrick Nuxoll, #2 Summons Ronald Cramer)(alw)
January 10, 2019 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Central Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 3:18-cv-00560-DCN for all future filings. (cjs)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Riseborough, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1826239.), filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet)(Riseborough, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Nuxoll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy M Zener
Represented By: John C Riseborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Cramer
Represented By: Karin Rosalind Seubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Cramer
Represented By: Karin Rosalind Seubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J Nuxoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?