Khurana v. State of Idaho, Child Support Services
Appellee: State of Idaho, Child Support Services
Appellant: Praveen Kevin Khurana
Case Number: 3:2019cv00117
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert H Whaley
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Appellant shall serve and file his opening brief by 8/5/2019. Appellee shall serve and file a response brief by 9/4/2019. Appellant may serve and file an optional reply brief by 9/18/2019. This matter shall be heard at 6:30 p.m. on 9/25/2019 without oral argument, unless oral argument is requested. Signed by Judge Robert H. Whaley. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE denying #8 Motion to Consolidate. Appellant's motion was filed ex parte and is therefore inaccessible to the Appellee and the public. Appellant's motion should not have been filed ex parte. The District Court Clerk is directed to make docket entry ECF No. 8 publicly accessible. Signed by Judge Robert H. Whaley. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Appellant Praveen Kevin Khurana. Responses due by 6/20/2019 (jp) Modified on 7/2/2019 to unseal per the Order dkt 9 (jp).
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Readiness (jp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Transcript of Oral Decision hearing held 4/10/19 before Judge Myers. (restriction of this transcript released on 8/8/19) (jp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Transmittal of Additional Documents as to Praveen Kevin Khurana including Statement of Issues, Notice of Record/Transcript and Statement of Transcripts. (jp)
May 13, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Please use case number 3:19-cv-00117-RHW on all future pleadings. (st)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Robert H. Whaley from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Appeal (jp)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of ORDER Granting In Forma Pauperis Application entered in by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Terry L. Myers (Attachments: #1 application (dkt 25 in adversary 19-7002))(jp)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court Adversary case number 19-07002-TLM. File received (Notice sent to ar, mb, TLM), filed by Praveen Kevin Khurana. (Attachments: #1 Notice of referral to DC/Third Amended General Order No. 38, #2 Docket Sheet Adversary 19-07002-TLM, #3 Memorandum of Decision and Order)(jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khurana v. State of Idaho, Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: State of Idaho, Child Support Services
Represented By: Douglas E Fleenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Praveen Kevin Khurana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?