Canfield v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Steve Canfield
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00159
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #6 Amended Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Madison Tate Donald appearing for Steve Canfield. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (*correcting attorney's first name)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Pro Hace Vice Appearance Richard R. Friess appearing for Plaintiff Steve Canfield. Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Friess, Richard)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #3 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Melanie Tate Donaldson for Steve Canfield. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 7, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case was opened with the southern division and it should be eastern. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 3:19-CV-159-DCN (jp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Melanie Tate Donaldson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1884373.)Richard R. Friess appearing for Plaintiff Steve Canfield. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Friess, Richard)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Steve Canfield. (Friess, Richard)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1882020.), filed by Steve Canfield. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Friess, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canfield v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Canfield
Represented By: Richard R. Friess
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?