Sanders v. University of Idaho College of Law et al

Plaintiff: Shaakirrah R Sanders
Defendant: Mark Adams and University of Idaho College of Law
Case Number: 3:2019cv00225
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Shaakirrah R Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery Plan)(Birch, Erika)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Mark Adams, Shaakirrah R Sanders, University of Idaho College of Law re #1 Complaint, #8 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/17/2019. (alw)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before August 15, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Mark Adams, University of Idaho College of Law.(Stromberg, Bentley)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bentley G Stromberg on behalf of Mark Adams, University of Idaho College of Law (Stromberg, Bentley)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaakirrah R Sanders. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Birch, Erika)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to University of Idaho College of Law. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
June 25, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, CWD recused. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 3:19-cv-00225-BLW (jd)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
June 25, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale for all further proceedings. Case no longer assigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 3:19-cv-225-CWD (jp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
June 20, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket number 2 Sealed Document as it was inadvertently filed in the wrong case. The image has been removed. (km)
June 19, 2019 RECEIPT: filing Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt #0976-1902786, final payment. (jd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Adams, University of Idaho College of Law, filed by Shaakirrah R Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Mark Adams, #3 Summons University of ID)(jd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Sealed Document. (km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. University of Idaho College of Law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Adams
Represented By: Sonyalee R Nutsch
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Idaho College of Law
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaakirrah R Sanders
Represented By: Lourdes Annette Matsumoto
Represented By: Erika Birch
Represented By: Thomas Guy Hallam, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?