Palken v. Olds, et al.
Plaintiff: Melina Palken
Defendant: Doug Giddings, John Does, Scott G. Olds and David Judd
Case Number: 3:2020cv00129
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David Judd.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/7/2020.(Reed, Dayton)
May 6, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT to Reply to Giddings, Olds and Judd Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Melina Palken re #18 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jd)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Doug Giddings, Scott G. Olds.(Stromberg, Bentley)
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Melina Palken re #14 Response to Motion. (jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2020: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of service) (jd).
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 Reply to Olds/Giddings Motion to Dismiss #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Melina Palken. Replies due by 5/18/2020.(jd)
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (jd)
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Bentley G Stromberg appearing for Defendants Doug Giddings, Scott G. Olds. Responses due by 5/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Counsel)(Stromberg, Bentley)
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Melina Palken. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jd)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Judd Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Preserve Evidence re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Melina Palken. Replies due by 5/6/2020.(jd)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for David Judd re #10 Notice of Appearance, #11 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/16/2020. (jd)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dayton Patrick Reed appearing for Defendant David Judd. Responses due by 5/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Reed, Dayton)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by W Scott Zanzig on behalf of David Judd (Zanzig, W)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayton Patrick Reed on behalf of David Judd (Reed, Dayton)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER denying #6 Motion for Default Judgment. The Answer was filed timely. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Memorandum in Opposition filed by Doug Giddings, Scott G. Olds. Replies due by 4/22/2020.(Stromberg, Bentley)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Doug Giddings, Scott G. Olds and to Melina Palken re #3 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/8/2020. (jd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION and Affidavit for Default against Defendants Olds and Giddings by Plaintiff Melina Palken. Responses due by 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Declaration)(jd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melina Palken for Douglas Giddings. (jd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melina Palken for Scott G. Olds. (jd)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Doug Giddings, Scott G. Olds.(Stromberg, Bentley)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Doug Giddings, David Judd and Scott G. Olds. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
March 10, 2020 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # idx25870 Paid in Full (ch)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS against John Does, Doug Giddings, David Judd, Scott G. Olds, filed by Melina Palken. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Letter)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palken v. Olds, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Giddings
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott G. Olds
Represented By: Bentley G Stromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Judd
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: W Scott Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melina Palken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?