Darr v. Idaho Forest Group LLC
Plaintiff: Omer Jason Darr
Defendant: Idaho Forest Group SUAS LLC, Does 1-10 and Idaho Forest Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00138
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Forest Group, LLC. (Heikkila, Kara)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Idaho Forest Group, LLC.(Heikkila, Kara)
April 15, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, This case was removed from Idaho County District Court which is in the Central Division. The case number has been changed from 2:20-cv-00138-CWD to 3:20-cv-00138-CWD. Nothing else has changed. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 3:20-cv-00138-CWD. (jp)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Does 1-10, Idaho Forest Group, LLC, filed by Omer Jason Darr.(Linscott, April)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 consent filed)(jp)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 5/28/20, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney April M Linscott for Omer Jason Darr added. Attorney Adam Howard Green terminated. Request to Leave Noticing ON for this case by Attorney (Linscott, April)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Omer Jason Darr, Idaho Forest Group SUAS LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/18/2020. (jp)
March 18, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Idaho Forest Group SUAS LLC served on 3/18/2020. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jp)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Forest Group SUAS LLC. (Heikkila, Kara)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Idaho Forest Group SUAS LLC from Idaho County District Court, case number CV25-20-0117.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2027470.), filed by Idaho Forest Group SUAS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #5 Exhibit D - State Court Docket)(Heikkila, Kara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darr v. Idaho Forest Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Forest Group SUAS LLC
Represented By: Kara L. Heikkila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Forest Group, LLC
Represented By: Kara L. Heikkila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omer Jason Darr
Represented By: Adam Howard Green
Represented By: April M Linscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?