Gallaher v. USA
Petitioner: James Howard Gallaher and Jamie Gallaher
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00249
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Traci Jo Whelan appearing for Respondent USA. Responses due by 6/19/2020 (Whelan, Traci)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION For an Order Concerning Attorney-Client Privilege Traci Jo Whelan appearing for Respondent USA. Responses due by 6/18/2020 (Whelan, Traci)
May 26, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management deadline set for 6/26/2020. (jd)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - The United States shall file a written response to the Petitioners motion within thirty (30) daysfrom the date of this scheduling order. The Petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days thereafter to file any reply brief. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( Criminal Action 3:19-cr-00173-BLW.), filed by James Howard Gallaher. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Transactions)(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallaher v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Howard Gallaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamie Gallaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Traci Jo Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?