State of Idaho v. Oelker
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Defendant: Jeromy Oelker
Case Number: 3:2020cv00383
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT - State court docket by Defendant Jeromy Oelker re #1 Notice of Removal. (jd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Quash by Defendant Jeromy Oelker. Responses due by 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(jd)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeromy Oelker (Attachments: #1 Transmission of verification report, #2 Prosecutor certificate)(jd)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Jeromy Oelker in regards to the corrective entry requesting the state court docket. (jd)
August 3, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal filed by Jeromy Oelker does not have the state court docket sheet as an attachment. The filing party shall submit the state court docket sheet.(jd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION to file under seal certain exhibits by Defendant Jeromy Oelker. Responses due by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeromy Oelker, filed by Jeromy Oelker. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Statement in Support, #3 Exhibit)(jd) Paid the filing fee receipt #1464.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Idaho v. Oelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeromy Oelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?