Van Orden et al v. Caribou County et al
Plaintiff: |
Alan Van Orden, Robert Bannister and Michelle Waleske |
Defendant: |
Caribou County, Caribou County Sheriff Dept., Ric L Anderson, Michael Haderlie, Brock Lopez, Heath Downs, Brandy Bredehoft, Judy Probart Long and Jodi Suter |
Case Number: |
4:2010cv00385 |
Filed: |
August 3, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Idaho |
Office: |
Pocatello - Eastern Office |
County: |
Caribou - Eastern |
Presiding Judge: |
B. Lynn Winmill |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1391 Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 9, 2015 |
Filing
214
ORDER, (Jury Trial set for 3/28/2016 01:30 PM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2015 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. In cases invol ving serious Daubert issues, the parties shall contact Jeff Severson 9/25/15 to determine whether a hearing is necessary: Case Management deadline set for 9/25/2015, Settlement-Mediation/Certiorari: the parties shall contact the Court on 2/10/16 if the Supreme Court has not issued a decision ). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
October 13, 2014 |
Filing
198
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendants' Motion to Reconsider (dkt. 188 ) is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (dkt. 93 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (dkt. 86 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
February 21, 2014 |
Filing
187
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 181 MOTION and Memorandum to Permit Additional Discovery. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jp)
|
October 25, 2012 |
Filing
173
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 161 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 163 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
|
June 8, 2012 |
Filing
155
JUDGMENT against Plaintiffs and in favor of Defendants, and that this case be DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
|
October 13, 2011 |
Filing
77
ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
71
ORDER ON MOTION TO CLARIFY AND FOR RECONSIDERATION denying 67 Motion to Clarify Order on Motions to Compel and to Limit Discovery and Motion for Reconsideration; clarifying 66 Order on Motions to Compel and to Limit Discovery. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
|
August 29, 2011 |
Filing
66
ORDER on Motions to Compel and to Limit Discovery granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Compel; denying 62 Motion for Discovery Sanctions; denying 63 Motion to Limit Discovery. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 33 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 37 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?