Danish Acres of Idaho, LLC v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: Danish Acres of Idaho, LLC
Defendant: Peter Phillips, Greg Skabelund, Shelley Skabelund and John or Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2011cv00495
Filed: October 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Franklin - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant's Motion for Award of Fees (Dkt. 55 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SECOND AMENDED DECREE of Foreclosure. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 33 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Danish Acres must provide the Court with a proposal, supported by Idaho law, for how the Court should now proceed in ordering foreclosure of the subject property, including whether the Court must conduct a hearing to determine the value of the property. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danish Acres of Idaho, LLC v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Phillips
Represented By: Ryan Lynn Holdaway
Represented By: Diane Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Skabelund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Skabelund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danish Acres of Idaho, LLC
Represented By: Steven R Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?