Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. v. United Potato Growers of America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Defendant: United Potato Growers of America Inc, United Potato Growers of Idaho Inc, United II Potato Growers of Idaho Inc, Wada Farms Inc, Wada Family, LLC, Wada Farms Potatoes Inc, Wada Farms Marketing Group LLC, Pro Fresh, LLC, Albert Wada, Blaine Larsen Farms Inc, Potandon Produce LLC, Michael Cranney, Cornelison Farms Inc, Snake River Plains Potatoes Inc, Driscoll Potatoes Inc, Lance Funk, Rigby Produce Inc, Pleasant Valley Potato Inc, KCW Farms, Inc., Kim Wahlen Farms, Raybould Brothers Farms LLC, RD Offutt Co, Ronald D. Offutt, Jr., Idahoan Foods LLC and Cedar Farms, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Potandon Produce LLC
Counter_defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00251
Filed: June 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting ( 437 in 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD, 928 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD) Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims by AWG against Potandon in the above-captioned action are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and all claims by Potandon against AWG in t he above captioned action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Defendant Idahoan Foods LLCs Motion to Modify Associated Wholesale Grocers Designation of Certain Documents as Highly Confidential (Dkt. 890) is DENIED (890 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 401 in 4:13-cv- 00251-BLW-CWD). 2. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.s Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b) on Potandon Produces Counterclaim (Dkt. 908) is GRANTED, and the Court will not stay proceedings related to a petition for costs. The Court wil l enter a separate Judgment on the counterclaim ( 419 in 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD, 908 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER denying SEALED MOTION Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc.'s Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and for Additional Time to Depose Defendants' Expert David T. Scheffman ( 431 in 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD, 922 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting ( 427 in 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD, 918 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD) Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims by Asociated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. against Defendants Blaine Larsen Farms, Inc., Driscoll Potatoes, Inc., and Rigby Produce, Inc. are dismissed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER. Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2016. Response briefs due by 11/21/2016. Reply briefs due by 12/12/2016. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting (871) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD; granting ( 385 ) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM DECISION. The rule of reason standard shall apply to Potandons counterclaim. Potandon shall notify the Court and AWG on or before 7/29/2015whether it intends to pursue its counterclaim. If it does, the Court will consider the process for w hether Potandon can amend its counterclaim inlight of the Courts ruling. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER denying without prejudice (694) Plaintiff AWGs Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (700) Potandons Motion for a Scheduling Order Regarding Its Counterclaim; denying (808) Plaintiff Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc .s Motion for Suggestion of Remand in case 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD; denying (334); granting in part and denying in part (238) in case 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 768 Associated Wholesale Grocers' Sealed Motion in case 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD; granting in part and denying in part 302 Associated Wholesale Grocers' Sealed Motion in case 4:13- cv-00251-BLW-CWD.The following Bates stamped documents are subject to disclosure: JWRW 011591 - JWRW 011593; JWRW 012460 - JWRW 012462; JWRW 012464 - JWRW 12466; JWRW 012467 - JWRW 012469; and JWRW 009033. Jones Waldo shall immediately produce th e above documents to AWG. Further, AWG may depose Randon Wilson for an additional three hours relative to documents produced after July 16, 2014, including those compelled by this Order. The Court defers any ruling regarding attorney fees. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(klw)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 493 Motion to Compel in case 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD; granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Compel in case 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(klw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. v. United Potato Growers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew L. Dameron
Represented By: Patrick J Stueve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Potato Growers of America Inc
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Potato Growers of Idaho Inc
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United II Potato Growers of Idaho Inc
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Farms Inc
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Family, LLC
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Farms Potatoes Inc
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Farms Marketing Group LLC
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Fresh, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Wada
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Larsen Farms Inc
Represented By: Monte N Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potandon Produce LLC
Represented By: Winston V Beard
Represented By: Adrian Fontecilla
Represented By: Michael D Gaffney
Represented By: Matthew McBurney
Represented By: Christopher Emrich Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cranney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelison Farms Inc
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snake River Plains Potatoes Inc
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driscoll Potatoes Inc
Represented By: Monte N Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Funk
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigby Produce Inc
Represented By: Monte N Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley Potato Inc
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCW Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Wahlen Farms
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raybould Brothers Farms LLC
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD Offutt Co
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: William L Greene
Represented By: Brian E McGovern
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Offutt, Jr.
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: William L Greene
Represented By: Brian E McGovern
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idahoan Foods LLC
Represented By: Neil D McFeeley
Represented By: James A Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Potandon Produce LLC
Represented By: Christopher Emrich Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew L. Dameron
Represented By: Patrick J Stueve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?