Jacobs Silver K Farms, Inc. et al v. Taylor Produce, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Jacobs Silver K Farms, Inc. and Kirk M Jacobs
Defendant: Taylor Produce LLC, Alan Taylor Produce, Inc., Alan L. Taylor, Idaho Potato Packers Corporation, Nonpareil Corporation, Nonpareil Farms, Inc., Nonpareil Processing Corporation and Nonpareil Dehydrated Potatoes, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00535
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Jefferson - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E. Bush
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2016 168 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION (138 in 4:13-cv-00535-BLW) re: MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Against Defendants, Taylor Produce, LLC and Alan L. Taylor, Jointly and Severally filed by Reynolds Bros., LLP, Jacobs Silver K Farms, I nc., Kirk M Jacobs.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:13-cv-00535-BLW, 4:14-cv-00141-BLW, 4:14-cv-00247-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 17, 2016 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Jury Trial set for 11/7/2016 01:30 PM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2016 04:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Settlement/Mediation Deadline: The parties shall notify the Court on or before 9/2/16, that the case has either settled or will definitely go to trial). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 30, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER The Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. 53 and 61 ) are GRANTED. The Third-Party Complaint and Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. 35 , 52 ) are DISMISSED as to the claim against Silver K Trucking. Defendants shall have until on or before 5/4/15 in which to file their Second Amended Third-Party Complaint as to their State Law Claim against Silver K Trucking. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs Silver K Farms, Inc. et al v. Taylor Produce, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacobs Silver K Farms, Inc.
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Charles A Homer
Represented By: Steven E Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk M Jacobs
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Charles A Homer
Represented By: Steven E Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Produce LLC
Represented By: Robin D Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Taylor Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Robin D Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan L. Taylor
Represented By: Robin D Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Potato Packers Corporation
Represented By: Robin D Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nonpareil Corporation
Represented By: Robin D Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nonpareil Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Robin D Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nonpareil Processing Corporation
Represented By: Robin D Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nonpareil Dehydrated Potatoes, Inc.
Represented By: Robin D Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?