Jacobs v. CDS, PA et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr
Defendant: CDS, PA, Pocatello Hospital, LLC and LHP Pocatello, LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv00301
Filed: July 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bannock - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff-Relators Renewed Motion for Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dkt. 71 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted to the extent that the Court will award plainti ffs $79,904 in fees and $1,130.57 costs. The motion is DENIED to the extent it seeks additional sums. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff-Relators Motion for Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dkt. 65 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUMD DECISION AND ORDER denying 20 Defendant CDS, P.A. d/b/a Pocatello Women's Health Clinic's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 21 Defendants Pocatello Hospital LLC, d/b/a Portneuf Medical Center, LLC and LHP Pocatello, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 28 Defendant's Joint Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. CDS, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDS, PA
Represented By: Daniel Carl Green
Represented By: Richard A Hearn
Represented By: Scott J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocatello Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Holly C Barker
Represented By: Howard D Burnett
Represented By: Scott A Memmott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHP Pocatello, LLC
Represented By: Holly C Barker
Represented By: Howard D Burnett
Represented By: Scott A Memmott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?