Norton et al v. Assured Performance Network
Plaintiff: Michael Norton and Steven Delacuesta
Defendant: Assured Performance Network
Case Number: 4:2014cv00486
Filed: November 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER re: 34 Memorandum Decision & Order.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (*amending footnote)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists, Exhibits, Proposed Voir Dire, Proposed Jury Instructions, Trial Briefs and Motions in Limine due by 5/3/2016. The parties agree that they shall notify the Court on or before 4/15/2016 that the case has either settled or will definitely go to trial. Jury Trial set for 5/31/2016 01:30 PM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2016 04:00 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)(Emailed to krb)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (docket no. 26 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are deemed employees under the FLSA and the Idaho law. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (docket no. 25 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER the Pro Se Notice of Appearance (docket no. 4 ) and the Answer (docket no. 5 ) are STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD AND WITHOUT EFFECT. Assured Performance Network is hereby NOTIFIED that its failure to obtain counsel and time ly file an Answer or other response will subject it to a Default Judgment that will result in an award to the Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton et al v. Assured Performance Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Norton
Represented By: James D Holman
Represented By: James Douglas Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Delacuesta
Represented By: James D Holman
Represented By: James Douglas Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assured Performance Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?