Hansen et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Sherri Hansen, A. R. and L. R.
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Green Tree Financial Servicing, LLC, Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP, Manufactured Housing Contract Senior/Subordinate Pass-Through Certificates, Series 1998-8 and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2015cv00085
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Teton - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The Court will not revise its previous order and hereby finds, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 70(e), Mr. Rasmussen in contempt for failing to comply with this Court's order sanctioning Mr. Rasmussen pursuant to Rule 11 in the amount of $9,735.76. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Hawley Troxell must serve a copy of this Order and the Motion for Contempt (Dkt. 44 ) on Mr. Rasmussen on or before August 9, 2019, and must file proof of service with the Court. 2. Mr. Rasmus sen must respond by filing a notice with the Court within fourteen days (14) days of service. 3. If Mr. Rasmussen timely responds, the Court will set a hearing on Hawley Troxells Motion for Contempt. However, if Mr. Rasmussen fails to respond or fails to timely respond, the Court will GRANT Hawley Troxells Motion for Contempt. (Dkt. 44.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jd)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER It is hereby ORDERED: 1. Mr. Rasmussen's Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b) (Dkt. 38 ) is GRANTED insofar as counsel seeks additional time to pay the sanctions award. The Motion (Dkt. 38) is oth erwise DENIED. 2. Mr. Rasmussen is not relieved of his obligation to pay a $9,735.76 sanction to the law firm of Hawley Troxell Ennis and Hawley LLP and a $25,110.00 sanction to the law firm of Lukins & Annis, P.S, per the terms of the Cour t's May 18, 2016 Order (Dkt. 37 ). Said amounts shall be paid within 8 months of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER It is ORDERED that Mr. Rasmussen pay a $9,735.76 sanction to the law firm of Hawley Troxell Ennis and Hawley LLP within 90 days of the date of this Order. It is further ORDERED that Mr. Rasmussen pay a $25,110.00 sanction to the law firm of Lukins & Annis, P.S. within 90 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER Defendants U.S. Bank and Green Tree Servicing's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 7 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Hawley Troxell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 11 ) is GRANTED. The Court will issue a separate judgment in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Hansen
Represented By: Troy E Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. R.
Represented By: Troy E Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. R.
Represented By: Troy E Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Financial Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufactured Housing Contract Senior/Subordinate Pass-Through Certificates, Series 1998-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?