Hathaway v. Idaho-Pacific Corporation
Plaintiff: Ross Hathaway
Defendant: Idaho-Pacific Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv00086
Filed: March 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiff Hathaways Motion for Terminating Sanctions (Dkt. 227 ) is GRANTED. Defendant IPCs Motion to File Excess Pages (Dkt. 236 ) is GRANTED. Defendant IPCs Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Motion for TerminatingSanction s (Dkt. 238 ) is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Defendant IPCs Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply (Dkt. 245 ) is DENIED. A jury trial shall be set at a later date to determine what damages Hathaway is owed. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. ((alw)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IPC's Rule 43 Motion is DENIED. Thibert's Motion to Quash is GRANTED. The parties may depose Thibert and use her testimony in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Hathaway's Motion to Amend to Seek Punitive Damages Pursuant to Idaho Code § 61604 (Dkt. 145 ) is GRANTED. The Court reserves the decision to submit Hathaway's claim for punitive damages to the jury unti l trial, after Plaintiff rests his case in chief and makes the appropriate motion. IPC's Motion to Strike (Dkt. 172 ) is DISMISSED AS MOOT. IPC's Motion to Expedite Decision on Defendant's Motion to Strike (Dkt. 173 ) is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. ((alw)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. It is HEREBY ORDERED: Hathaways Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 119 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: Ross Hathaway's Motion for Entry of Partial Judgment and to Set Re-Trial of the ADA Claims (Dkt. 109 ) is DENIED. Idaho Pacific Corporation's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on All Claims, or in the Alternative, Motion for a New Trial on Claim for Termination in Violation of Public Policy (Dkt. 107 ) is DENIED. The Court declares a mistrial and orders a new trial on all claims. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (km)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 57 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Margaret Johnson as a Witness, or in the Alternative, Prohibit Defendant from Re-opening Discovery (Dkt. 37 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Regarding Hearsay Evidence and Unauthenticated Statements Made by Margaret Johnson and Linda Bair (Dkt. 38 ) is GRANTED. IPC may not present the 2013 audio recordings of interviews with Johnson or Bair at trial. Defendants Motion for Leave to Take De Bene Esse Depos ition of Unavailable Witness Margaret Johnson, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Reopen Discovery for Limited Purpose of Deposing Margaret Johnson (Dkt. 41 ) is DENIED.Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRIAL SETTING ORDER - A 5-day Jury Trial set for 9/18/2017 01:30 PM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2017 03:00 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Rule 702 Mot ions due by 4/3/2017. Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists, Proposed Voir Dire, Proposed Jury Instructions, Trial Briefs and Motions in Limine due by 8/4/2017. The parties agree that they shall notify the Court on or before 8/4/2017, that the case has either settled or will definitely go to trial (Case Management deadline set for 8/4/2017). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hathaway v. Idaho-Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Hathaway
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho-Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?