Miller v. Lemhi County et al
Plaintiff: Nova Miller
Defendant: Lemhi County, John Jakovac, Richard Snyder and Robert Cope
Case Number: 4:2015cv00156
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Lemhi - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Candy W. Dale
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: Miller's Motion 42 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Miller's Motion 43 is DENIED. Miller's Motion 44 is DENIED. Miller's Motion 45 is DENIED AS PREMATURE. Miller's Motion 46 is DENIED AS PREMATURE. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 15 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated herein. A telephonic status conference with Staff Attorney Kira Dale is set for July 6, 2017, at 9:00 a.m., for the purpose of discussing a trial setting and any related filing deadlines. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call and must have all appropriate parties on the line. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (km)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motions to Strike (Dkt. 18 ) and (Dkt. 22 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Lemhi County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nova Miller
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lemhi County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jakovac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?