Caribou County v. USA
Plaintiff: Caribou County
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2015cv00335
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Caribou - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Referring Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2409
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the #44 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Caribou County. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dmc)
July 31, 2017 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Caribou County. (Cavanaugh, Jaimie)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY OF PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES re #42 - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the existing pre-trial deadlines are vacated for a period of approximately 45 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if the action is resolved via the parties' continued settlement negotiations, Plaintiff's counsel shall immediately notify the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event the matter is not so resolved, the Partiesshall file a joint status report on or before 7/31/2017 (Status Report due by 7/31/2017). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
June 9, 2017 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Stay re #39 Order, David L Negri appearing for Defendant United States of America. Responses due by 6/30/2017 (Negri, David) Modified on 6/13/2017 (cjs).
June 5, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gealy England on behalf of United States of America (England, Christine)
April 14, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE by United States of America of Withdrawal of Counsel (Barker, Paul)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE THE EXISTING PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES (Docket No. #38 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The existing pre-trial deadlines are vacated for a period of approximately 60 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if the action is resolved via the parties' continued settlement negotiations, Plaintiff's counsel shall immediately notify the Court. In the event the matter is not resolved, the Parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 11, 2017, proposing therein, new pre-trial deadlines for the efficient resolution of this case. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. Motions terminated: #38 Consent MOTION to Vacate Existing Pre-trial Deadlines filed by Caribou County. (Status Report due by 6/11/2017.) (km)
April 12, 2017 Filing 38 Consent MOTION to Vacate Existing Pre-trial Deadlines Jaimie Cavanaugh appearing for Plaintiff Caribou County.Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 5/3/2017 (Cavanaugh, Jaimie)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DOCKET ORDER GRANTING #30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is hereby ordered that attorney Jeffrey W. McCoy is granted leave to withdraw from this case. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
March 17, 2017 Filing 36 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/17/2017. Court and counsel convened telephonically to discuss case status. Counsel for Plaintiff advised the parties are still engaged in productive settlement negotiations. Parties shall inform the settlement judge on or before 3/31/2017 as to whether a resolution has been reached. Time in Court 10:00-10:05 AM. (Hearing not recorded.) (at)
February 28, 2017 Filing 35 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Settlement Conference held on 2/28/2017. Counsel/parties appeared and negotiated under the Court's direction and supervision. Parties agreed to continue further settlement negotiations and shall inform the settlement judge on or before 3/17/2017 as to whether a resolution has been reached. Time in Court 9:30 AM-3:35 PM. (Hearing not recorded.) (at)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES IN THIS COURT'S MAY 31, 2016 SCHEDULING ORDER (Docket No. #31 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #32 Motion to Excuse Local Counsel John L. Runft from attending the settlement conference, to be held before the undersigned on February 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
February 21, 2017 Set Deadlines/Hearings per Order, Dkt. 34: Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2017. Factual Discovery due by 4/15/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2017. Pre-trial Motions due by 11/29/2017. (km)
February 17, 2017 Filing 32 Consent MOTION Excuse Attendance of Local Counsel at Settlement Conference on February 28, 2017 Jaimie Cavanaugh appearing for Plaintiff Caribou County.Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 3/10/2017 (Cavanaugh, Jaimie)
February 14, 2017 Filing 31 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadlines in this Court's May 31, 2016 Scheduling Order Jaimie Cavanaugh appearing for Plaintiff Caribou County. Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 3/7/2017 (Cavanaugh, Jaimie) Modified on 2/14/2017 to correct docket text per phone call from the office of Jaimie Cavanaugh (km).
January 27, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Jeffrey W. McCoy Request to Turn Electronic Noticing OFF (no longer receive NEFs in this case only) by AttorneyJeffrey McCoy appearing for Plaintiff Caribou County.Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 2/21/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCoy, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2017 Filing 29 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jaimie Cavanaugh for Caribou County. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
January 18, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jaimie Cavanaugh. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1538462.)John L Runft appearing for Plaintiff Caribou County.Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 2/13/2017 (Runft, John)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING #26 Joint Motion to Extend Settlement Conference Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
January 13, 2017 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Settlement -- Extension of ADR Conference Deadline David L Negri appearing for Defendant United States of America.Motions referred to Ronald E. Bush. Responses due by 2/6/2017 (Negri, David)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a settlement conference is set to take place on February 28, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. at the United States Courthouse in Pocatello before United States Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale. Each party shall prepare a response to the Settlement Conference Questionnaire and submit it to Judge Dale's chambers for in camera review no later than February 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (Case Management deadline set for 2/21/2017., Settlement Conference set for 2/28/2017 09:30 AM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge Candy W. Dale.) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER modifying settlement judge referral to United States Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale. The parties who have settlement authority will participate in settlement conference on or before February 15, 2017, before Judge Dale. The parties are to contact Amy Tate (amy_tate@id.uscourts.gov) to schedule the conference. All other matters contained in #23 Scheduling Order remain. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dmc)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER ( Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2017. Discovery due by 2/15/2017. The parties who have settlement authority shall participate in settlement conference on or before 2/15/17, before United States Magistrate Judge Larry M. Boyle.Pre-Trial Motions due by 9/29/2017.) Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 26, 2016 Filing 22 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by United States of America. (Negri, David)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT re #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF REFERENCE. All matters are referred to United States Magistrate Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 8, 2016 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Lodge for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:15-cv-335-EJL (jp)
January 8, 2016 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jp)
January 5, 2016 Filing 19 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
December 18, 2015 Filing 18 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Barker, Paul)
December 18, 2015 Filing 17 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, by United States of America.(Barker, Paul)
November 24, 2015 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caribou County re #13 Response to Motion, #12 Amended Complaint, (McCoy, Jeffrey)
November 24, 2015 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #13 Response to Motion, #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Caribou County were filed incorrectly in this case as it pertains to the Certificate of Service only. The filing party shall refer to ECF Procedure 8 and re-submit their correct certificate of service using Certificate of Service located under Service of Process and link to the docket entry.(cjs)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING unopposed #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until December 18, 2015 to file its response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
November 23, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint, David L Negri appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 12/17/2015 (Negri, David)
November 20, 2015 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Caribou County. Replies due by 12/7/2015.(McCoy, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2015 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against United States of America, filed by Caribou County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- 1948 Map, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Screenshot of Portion of 1968 Map, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Screenshot of Portion of 1975 Map, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Screenshots of Portions of 1978 Map, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5- Soda Hills TMP EA)(McCoy, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul David Barker on behalf of United States of America (Barker, Paul)
November 5, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Caribou County, United States of America re #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/7/2016. (jp)(RE-DOCKETED to generate Response due date)
November 5, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Caribou County, United States of America re #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (jp)
October 30, 2015 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by United States of America. Amendment to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Certificate of Service. (Negri, David)
October 30, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction David L Negri appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 11/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Negri, David)
September 11, 2015 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caribou County. United States of America served on 8/31/2015, answer due 10/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Returned Civil Process Clerk Summons)(McCoy, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2015 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
August 21, 2015 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #2 , #3 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Steven J. Lechner and Jeffrey Wilson McCoy on behalf of Caribou County. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 20, 2015 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1337690.)John L Runft appearing for Plaintiff Caribou County. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Runft, John)
August 20, 2015 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Steven J. Lechner. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1337688.)John L Runft appearing for Plaintiff Caribou County. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Runft, John)
August 20, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1337682.), filed by Caribou County. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General of the United States, #3 Summons Civil Process Clerk United States Attorney's Office)(Runft, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caribou County v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Represented By: David L Negri
Represented By: Paul David Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribou County
Represented By: Steven Douglas Wood
Represented By: Steven J Lechner
Represented By: John L Runft
Represented By: Jaimie Cavanaugh
Represented By: Jeffrey McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?