Walker v. City of Pocatello et al
Plaintiff: John Walker
Defendant: City of Pocatello and Scott Marchand
Case Number: 4:2015cv00498
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bannock - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: The Parties orally moved for clarification whether Plaintiff's Rehabilitation Act retaliation claim should be submitted to the jury. The Court requested supplemental briefing (Dkt. 93 , 94 ). ORDERED: Plaintiff's Rehabilitation Act retaliation claim shall be submitted to the jury. FURTHER ORDERED: Plaintiff shall submit a proposed jury instruction by July 17, 2020 or prior to any re-set trial. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (wcf)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Dkt. 103 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (wcf)
July 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Defendants' Motion in Limine 80 is granted in part and denied in part as described in the order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (wcf)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Dkt. 79 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER- It is ORDERED that the City's Motion to Reconsider (Dkt. 68 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions is DENIED. The City's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Declaration is DEEMED MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 46 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:1. Defendants do not need to produce the documents provided to the Court in Dkt. 49 to Walker. 2. Walker shall respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 46 ) on or before October 24, 2017. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions 32 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Investigative Materials 40 is GRANTED. The Motion to S tay 47 is GRANTED. Briefing on the motion for summary judgment is stayed until the Court reviews the emails and issues its decision. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. 18 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss. It is granted, without prejudice, as to Counts III-VI against defendants Marchand and Schei. It is denied as to Count VI. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. City of Pocatello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Walker
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pocatello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?