Putnam v. Boll et al
Plaintiff: |
Jennifer Putnam |
Defendant: |
Pete Boll and City of Pocatello |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00013 |
Filed: |
January 8, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Idaho |
Office: |
Pocatello - Eastern Office |
County: |
Bannock - Eastern |
Presiding Judge: |
B. Lynn Winmill |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 14, 2017 |
Filing
57
AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re 56 Memorandum Decision and Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendants' Motion for Allowance of Attorney fees (Dkt. 44 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (Reconsideration) (Dkt. 45 ) is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Correct Oversight or Omission Re: Bill of Costs (Dkt. 49 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
August 28, 2017 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 30 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; deeming as moot 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude; deeming as moot 26 Defendant's Motion to Strike; deeming as moot 35 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
|
December 8, 2016 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 16 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs federal claims of Wrongful Arrest, False Imprisonment, Taking of Putnams liberty and property without due pro cess, and Excessive Force shall be dismissed with PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs state and federal claims of malicious prosecution are not dismissed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
|
March 16, 2016 |
Filing
15
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - ADR Plan to be filed by 5/15/2016. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2016. Discovery due by 12/30/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2017. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
|
January 22, 2016 |
Filing
2
ORDER granting 1 Motion to Waive. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?