Yellowstone Poky, LLC. v. First Pocatello Associates, L.P.
Plaintiff: Yellowstone Poky, LLC.
Defendant: First Pocatello Associates, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00316
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bannock - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES & COSTS. First Pocatellos renewed motion for attorney fees and costs (Dkt. 164 ) is GRANTED. The Court awards First Pocatello attorney fees in the amount of $133,654.50 and costs in the amount of $949.26. Signed by Judge Dee V Benson. (alw)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's Motion 7 is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant's Motion 16 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's Motion 24 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's Second Motion to Ame nd/Correct Complaint 61 is also GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. No later than 14 days after the issuance of this order, Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Motion 25 is DENIED. Roger Featherston's Motion 26 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion 30 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion 54 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall strike any reference to FHI as a Plaintiff. Plaintiff's Motion 60 is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Court sua sponte grants Plaintiff LEAVE TO AMEND its Complaint 24 to correct the above-mentioned jurisdictional defect. Plaintiff must file its amended Complaint within 14 days of the filing dat e of this Order. 2. The Court RESERVES RULING on Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Dkt. 30 ) and all other pending motions. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER STAYING CASE This action shall be stayed until 12/5/16. The motion hearing currently set for November 10, 2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellowstone Poky, LLC. v. First Pocatello Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yellowstone Poky, LLC.
Represented By: John M. Avondet
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Pocatello Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Howard D. Burnett
Represented By: John K Olson
Represented By: Steven F Schossberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?