Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company, Inc. v. Lakeview Cheese Company LLC
Plaintiff: Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company, Inc.
Defendant: Lakeview Cheese Company LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv00427
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Madison - Eastern
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Lakeviews Motion (Dkt. 136 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Lakeview's Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkt. 135 ) is GRANTED. The Court hereby awards Lakeview attorney fees in the amount of $21,692.00. NRCC has 30 days from the date of this order to tender the fees awarded. Lakeview's Motion for Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 136 ) is GRANTED in PART to the extent the Court will issue an order to show cause and hold a hearing on the same. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Lakeview's Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkt. 96 ) is GRANTED. Lakeview's Motion to Supplement (Dkt. 108 )13 is GRANTED. The Court hereby awards Lakeview $292,270.91. NRCC has 30 days to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Lakeview's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 70 ) is GRANTED. Lakeview's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Laura Thieme and MichaelGreenberg (Dkt. 79 ) is DENIED. NRCC's Motion to Supplement (Dkt. 89 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Lakeview's Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. 83 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. All fees and costs will be awarded EXCEPT those requested by H1 Law Group. The Court hereby awards Lakeview attorney fees in the am ount of $12,279.50 and costs in the amount of $232.25 for a total award of $12,511.75. NRCC has 30 days to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Lakeview's Motion to File Amended Answer (Dkt. 66 ) is DENIED. Lakeview will have 14 days from the date of this order to file a Rule 37 Motion along with an accounting of all costs and fees associated with quashi ng the subpoenas. NRCC will then have 7 days to file any objections to the Motion and accounting. Lakeview will then have 3 days to reply. NRCC's Motion to Strike (Dkt. 69 ) is DENIED. NRCC's Motion to Seal (Dkt. 74 ) is GRANTED. The Cou rt will hold oral argument on Lakeview's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 70 ), and any associated Motions, on/5/24/17, at 2PM in Pocatello District Courtroom. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant Lakeview's Emergency MOTION to Quash Subpoenas and to Issue Protective Order (Dkt. 47 ) is GRANTED. The 15 subpoenas are hereby quashed and NRCC must immediately notify all 15 of the non-parties that the subpoenas are quashed and need not be complied with. A protective order is hereby issued requiring NRCC to seek the discovery at issue from Lakeview directly through discovery or a motion to compel if necessary. Plaintiff NRCC's Motion to Seal (Dkt. 50 ) is GRANTED. Dkt. 52 shall remain under seal until further notice Lakeview's Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. 54 ) is GRANTED. The dates as outlined in the document are hereby adopted by the Court. Lakeview's Motion to Suppl ement Protective Order (Dkt. 55 ) is GRANTED. As the language is very specific, the Court will enter a separate order so that the Supplement and its parameters will be in the official record. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company's Motion to Amend Complaint (Dkt. 32 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company shall file their amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company, Inc. v. Lakeview Cheese Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Wayne Allen
Represented By: John Michael Avondet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Cheese Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?