Arizona Lithium Company Ltd. et al v. North American Cobalt Inc
Plaintiff: Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp and International Cobalt Corp
Defendant: Battery Mineral Resources, Inc. and North American Cobalt Inc
Case Number: 4:2017cv00351
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Lemhi - Eastern
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that final Judgment be issued in this case dismissing Plaintiffs' Complaint and Defendant-Counterclaimant's Counter Claims with Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that the Clerk close this case. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION of Dismissal by North American Cobalt Inc, North American Cobalt Inc. (Barker, Albert)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp of Withdrawal of Counsel (Olson, Wendy)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following deadlines and procedures shall govern the remainder of this litigation: A 7-day trial shall be set for September 21, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Pocatello, Idaho. A telephonic pretrial conference shall be held on August 31, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The Court can be reached at (208) 334-9022. The parties agree that they shall notify the Court on or before August 10, 2020 that the case has either settled or will definitely go to trial. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE by North American Cobalt Inc, North American Cobalt Inc re #73 Memorandum Decision,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, of Unavailable Trial Dates (Barker, Albert)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., International Cobalt Corp re #73 Memorandum Decision,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, Unavailable Trial Dates (Olson, Wendy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re #59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony not Previously Disclosed and Evidence Created by Plaintiffs after Close of Discovery filed by North American Cobalt Inc, #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North American Cobalt Inc, and #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by International Cobalt Corp, Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: NAC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #45 ) is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. NAC's Motion (Dkt. #45 ) is further GRANTED to the extent it seeks dismissal of BOCO Claims 3-8. The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Arizona Lithium's Motion for Partial Summary (Dkt. #50 ) is DENIED. NAC's Motion in Limine (Dkt. #59 ) is dismissed as moot. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall submit their unavailable trial dates starting in January, 2020, and also state how many days they believe it will take to try this matter. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COURT that counsel Anna E. Courtney wishes to no longer be noticed electronically on this case as of the date of this notice. (Courtney, Anna)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Megan A Olmstead for Arizona Lithium Company Ltd.,Megan A Olmstead for Arizona Lithium Company Ltd.,Megan A Olmstead for Idaho Metals Corp,Megan A Olmstead for Idaho Metals Corp,Megan A Olmstead for International Cobalt Corp,Megan A Olmstead for International Cobalt Corp added. Attorney Anna E Courtney terminated. (Olmstead, Megan)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY re #67 Notice (Other) filed by North American Cobalt Inc, North American Cobalt Inc . (Barker, Albert)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE re #67 Notice (Other) filed by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp . (Olson, Wendy)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority on or before due by 8/28/2019. Defendant's Reply due by 8/30/2019. (ckh)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re #68 MOTION to Strike #67 Notice (Other) or Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by International Cobalt Corp, Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Dkt. 68) the Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendant (Dkt. 67) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court will not strike the Notice of Supplemental Authority. However, Plaintiff is granted leave to file a short (not to exceed five pages) response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority on or before August 28, 2019. Defendant may file a short (not to exceed two pages) reply on or before August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (nt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Strike #67 Notice (Other) or Leave to File Sur-Reply Wendy Olson appearing for Plaintiffs Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Olson, Wendy)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE by North American Cobalt Inc, North American Cobalt Inc re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Barker, Albert)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C. Nye: Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2019 re #59 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony not Previously Disclosed and Evidence Created by Plaintiffs after Close of Discovery filed by North American Cobalt Inc, #45 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by North American Cobalt Inc, #50 Motion for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by International Cobalt Corp, Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp. Matters are deemed UNDER ADVISEMENT and the Court will issue a Written Decision. (Court Reporter/ESR Katherine Eismann.) (paf)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony not Previously Disclosed and Evidence Created by Plaintiffs after Close of Discovery filed by North American Cobalt Inc, North American Cobalt Inc.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/7/2019.(Barker, Albert)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on MOTION for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 45), MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) (Dkt. 50) and MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony not Previously Disclosed and Evidence Created by Plaintiffs after Close of Discovery (Dkt. 59): A Hearing is RESET on these motions for 4/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge David C. Nye. (ab)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony not Previously Disclosed and Evidence Created by Plaintiffs after Close of Discovery filed by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp. Replies due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wendy Olson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Olson Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Olson Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Olson Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Olson Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Olson Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Olson Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Olson Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Olson Decl.)(Olson, Wendy)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on MOTION for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 45), MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) (Dkt. 50) and MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony not Previously Disclosed and Evidence Created by Plaintiffs after Close of Discovery (Dkt. 59): A Hearing is set on these motions for 2/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge David C. Nye. (ab)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North American Cobalt Inc, North American Cobalt Inc.(Barker, Albert)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Jonas A. Reagan (Third) re #59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony not Previously Disclosed and Evidence Created by Plaintiffs after Close of Discovery filed by North American Cobalt Inc, North American Cobalt Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibt A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Barker, Albert)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony not Previously Disclosed and Evidence Created by Plaintiffs after Close of Discovery Albert P Barker appearing for Counter Claimant North American Cobalt Inc, Defendant North American Cobalt Inc. Responses due by 12/21/2018 (Barker, Albert)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wendy Olson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Olson Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Olson Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Olson Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Olson Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Olson Decl.)(Olson, Wendy)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ERRATA by Counter Claimant North American Cobalt Inc, Defendant North American Cobalt Inc re #56 Response to Motion,, . (Attachments: #1 Ex. A to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #2 Ex. B to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #3 Ex. C to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #4 Ex. D to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #5 Ex. E to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #6 Ex. F to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #7 Ex. G to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #8 Ex. H to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #9 Ex. I to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #10 Ex. J to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #11 Ex. K to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #12 Ex. L to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #13 Ex. M to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #14 Ex. N to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #15 Ex. O to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #16 Ex. P to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #17 Ex. Q to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #18 Ex. R to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #19 Ex. S to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #20 Ex. T to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #21 Ex. U to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #22 Ex. V to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #23 Ex. W to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #24 Ex. X to 2nd Reagan Declaration, #25 Ex. Y to 2nd Reagan Declaration)(Barker, Albert)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by North American Cobalt Inc, North American Cobalt Inc. Replies due by 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Second Declaration of Jonas Reagan, #3 Exhibit A-F to the Second Declaration, #4 Exhibit G-M to the Second Declaration, #5 Exhibit N-T to the Second Declaration, #6 Exhibit U-Y to the Second Declaration)(Barker, Albert) Modified on 2/6/2019 to refer to Errata Dkt. #57 for Second Declaration of Jonas Reagan (cjs).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp. Replies due by 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Declaration of Sandra Sullivan, #3 Exhibit A to Sullivan Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Sullivan Decl., #5 Declaration of Tim Johnson, #6 Exhibit A to Johnson Decl., #7 Declaration of Neil McCallum, #8 Exhibit i to McCallum Decl., #9 Declaration of Wendy Olson, #10 Exhibit 1 to Olson Decl., #11 Exhibit 2 to Olson Decl., #12 Exhibit 3 to Olson Decl., #13 Exhibit 4 to Olson Decl., #14 Exhibit 5 to Olson Decl., #15 Exhibit 6 to Olson Decl., #16 Exhibit 7 to Olson Decl., #17 Exhibit 8 to Olson Decl., #18 Exhibit 9 to Olson Decl., #19 Exhibit 10 to Olson Decl., #20 Exhibit 11 to Olson Decl., #21 Exhibit 12 to Olson Decl., #22 Exhibit 13 to Olson Decl., #23 Exhibit 14 to Olson Decl., #24 Exhibit 15 to Olson Decl., #25 Exhibit 16 to Olson Decl., #26 Exhibit 17 to Olson Decl., #27 Exhibit 18 to Olson Decl.)(Olson, Wendy)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs shall have the opportunity to reopen David Viciedos deposition and ask questions related to his conversation with Scott Close as outlined above. Defendants will bear the costs associated with this re-deposition. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES AND REPLIES TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS re #52 Stipulation for Motions Dkt. #45 , #50 - Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies to Summary Judgment Motions by North American Cobalt Inc. (Barker, Albert)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial). Responses due by 11/16/2018. Replies due by 11/30/2018. By Order Dkt. #53 .(cjs)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ERRATA by Defendant North American Cobalt Inc re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Jonas Reagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit)(Barker, Albert)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Jonas Reagan, #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Jonas Reagan, #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Jonas Regan, #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Jonas Reagan filed by North American Cobalt Inc were filed incorrectly in this case. These entries are not motions. They are supporting exhibits to the Declaration of Jonas Reagan re: the Motion for Summary Judgment Dkt. 45. They should have been filed as attachments to Dkt 46. If filed separately, the correct event is "Declaration" and the exhibits should be attachments. The Declaration should only be filed one time. Exhibit may be filed separately using the event of "Supplement". Both of these events are located under Other Documents. The Clerk's Office will edit the entries.(cjs)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) Wendy Olson appearing for Plaintiffs Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp. Responses due by 11/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Declaration of Sandra Sullivan, #4 Exhibit A to Sullivan Decl., #5 Exhibit B, Pt 1 to Sullivan Decl., #6 Exhibit B, Pt 2 to Sullivan Decl., #7 Exhibit C to Sullivan Decl., #8 Declaration of Wendy Olson, #9 Exhibit 1 to Olson Decl., #10 Exhibit 2 to Olson Decl., #11 Exhibit 3 to Olson Decl., #12 Exhibit 4 to Olson Decl., #13 Exhibit 5 to Olson Decl., #14 Exhibit 6 to Olson Decl., #15 Exhibit 7 to Olson Decl., #16 Exhibit 8 to Olson Decl., #17 Exhibit 9 to Olson Decl., #18 Exhibit 10 to Olson Decl., #19 Exhibit 11 to Olson Decl., #20 Exhibit 12 to Olson Decl., #21 Exhibit 13 to Olson Decl., #22 Exhibit 14 to Olson Decl., #23 Exhibit 15 to Olson Decl., #24 Exhibit 16 to Olson Decl., #25 Exhibit 17 to Olson Decl., #26 Exhibit 18 to Olson Decl., #27 Exhibit 19 to Olson Decl., #28 Exhibit 20 to Olson Decl., #29 Exhibit 21 to Olson Decl., #30 Exhibit 22 to Olson Decl., #31 Exhibit 23 to Olson Decl., #32 Exhibit 24 to Olson Decl., #33 Exhibit 25 to Olson Decl., #34 Exhibit 26 to Olson Decl., #35 Exhibit 27 to Olson Decl., #36 Exhibit 28 to Olson Decl., #37 Exhibit 29 to Olson Decl., #38 Exhibit 30 to Olson Decl., #39 Exhibit 31 to Olson Decl.)(Olson, Wendy) Modified on 10/22/2018 (cjs).
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECLARATION of Jonas Reagan Albert P Barker appearing for Defendant North American Cobalt Inc re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 28 of 42, #2 Part 29 of 42, #3 Part 30 of 42, #4 Part 31 of 42, #5 Part 32 of 42, #6 Part 33 of 42, #7 Part 34 of 42, #8 Part 35 of 42, #9 Part 36 of 42, #10 Part 37 of 42, #11 Part 38 of 42, #12 Part 39 of 42, #13 Part 40 of 42, #14 Part 41 of 42, #15 Part 42 of 42)(Barker, Albert) Modified on 10/22/2018 per Corrective Entry (cjs).
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DECLARATION of Jonas Reagan Albert P Barker appearing for Defendant North American Cobalt Inc re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 13 of 42, #2 Part 14 of 42, #3 Part 15 of 42, #4 Part 16 of 42, #5 Part 17 of 42, #6 Part 18 of 42, #7 Part 19 of 42, #8 Part 20 of 42, #9 Part 21 of 42, #10 Part 22 of 42, #11 Part 23 of 42, #12 Part 24 of 42, #13 Part 25 of 42, #14 Part 26 of 42, #15 Part 27 of 42)(Barker, Albert) Modified on 10/22/2018 per Corrective Entry (cjs).
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECLARATION of Jonas Regan Albert P Barker appearing for Defendant North American Cobalt Inc re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 6 of 42, #2 Part 7 of 42, #3 Part 8 of 42, #4 Part 9 of 42, #5 Part 10 of 42, #6 Part 11 of 42, #7 Part 12 of 42)(Barker, Albert) Modified on 10/22/2018 per Corrective Entry (cjs).
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of Jonas Reagan Albert P Barker appearing for Defendant North American Cobalt Inc re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 42, #2 Part 2 of 42, #3 Part 3 of 42, #4 Part 4 of 42, #5 Part 5 of 42)(Barker, Albert) Modified on 10/22/2018 per Corrective Entry (cjs).
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment Albert P Barker appearing for Defendant North American Cobalt Inc. Responses due by 11/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibits to Statement of Material Fact, #4 Declaration of Scott Close, #5 Declaration of Jonas Reagan)(Barker, Albert) Modified on 10/22/2018 (cjs).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Dkt #38 ) AND SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, re #42 Stipulation filed by International Cobalt Corp, Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp. (Dispositive Motions deadline reset to 10/19/2018.) Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT of Mediation by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp(Olson, Wendy)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION re #38 Order,, Set Deadlines, Amend Amended Case Management Order by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation)(Olson, Wendy)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mikel H. Williams: Settlement Conference held on 9/6/2018 Case not settled, however parties will continue negotiations and will report back to the Court by 9/21/2018 if Settlement can not be reached, if more time is needed or if they request further settlement conference with Judge Mikel H. Williams. Time in Court 6 hours. Status Report Due deadline set for 9/21/2018. (Court Reporter/ESR Not Recorded.) Hearing Not Recorded. (so)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Settlement Conference set for 9/6/2018 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge Mikel H. Williams (Boise setting). Each party shall prepare and submit to the Court on or before August 30, 2018 at 5:00 p.m., a candid summation of its assessment of the strengths of its case and the strengths of the opposing partys case. The confidential summation shall be submitted in camera via email. In no event shall it be filed electronically (Case Management deadline set for 8/30/2018). Signed by Judge Mikel H. Williams. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this matter is referred to U.S. Magistrate Mikel H. Williams for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (wm)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re #37 Stipulation. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2018. Discovery due by 8/21/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2018. Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference shall be held by 9/14/2018. Motions due by 10/5/2018.). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION re #23 Case Management Order, to Amend Case Management Order by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Idaho Metals Corp, International Cobalt Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Wendy) Modified on 7/20/2018 (cjs).
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER to #34 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd..(Courtney, Anna)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Cobalt Inc identifying Corporate Parent Battery Mineral Resources, Inc. for North American Cobalt Inc.. (Barker, Albert)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by North American Cobalt Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Barker, Albert) Modified on 6/28/2018 (cjs).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Cobalt Corp. (Olson, Wendy)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Metals Corp identifying Corporate Parent 1142888 BC LTD for Idaho Metals Corp.. (Olson, Wendy)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against North American Cobalt Inc, filed by International Cobalt Corp, Idaho Metals Corp, Arizona Lithium Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2, #4 Exhibit C, Part 1, #5 Exhibit C, Part 2, #6 Exhibit C, Part 3, #7 Exhibit C, Part 4)(Olson, Wendy)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO JOIN PLAINTIFF IDAHO METALS CORP AND INTERNATIONAL COBALT CORP. AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #29 Stipulation. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION to Join Plaintiffs and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation)(Olson, Wendy)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting #27 Stipulation and amending #23 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION re #23 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Hearings,,, to Amend Case Management Order by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. (Barker, Albert)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Defendant Battery Minerals Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with Idaho Code section 47-611 (Dkt. #12 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C. Nye: Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2018 re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with I.C. Section 47-611 filed by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc. Matter is deemed UNDER ADVISEMENT and the Court will issue a Written Decision. (Court Reporter/ESR Katherine Eismann.) (paf)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd. re #15 Response to Motion Filing of Amended Location Notices (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wendy Olson, #2 Exhibit to Olson Declaration)(Olson, Wendy)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2018. Discovery due by 8/7/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2018. Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference shall be held by 8/31/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018.). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd.. (Olson, Wendy)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DISCOVERY PLAN by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd. (Stipulated). (Olson, Wendy)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with I.C. Section 47-611 : Hearing set for 1/17/2018 at 09:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge David C. Nye. (ab)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with I.C. Section 47-611 filed by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc..(Barker, Albert)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 12/27/2017 for the the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2018 10:30 AM in Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with I.C. Section 47-611. Replies due by 11/8/2017. Pursuant to Order Dkt. 17. (cjs)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re #16 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc. Pursuant to Idaho Local District Civil Rule 7.1.(a)(2), a reply brief cannot exceed 10 pages without written permission of the Court. Written permission was not sought here nor will it be granted. Defendant Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.'s Reply to Response to Motion (Dkt. 16) is hereby stricken. Defendant shall have until November 8, 2017 to re-file an appropriate brief not to exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ab)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STRICKEN - REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with I.C. Section 47-611 filed by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc..(Barker, Albert) Modified on 11/3/2017 to reflect stricken by Order Dkt. 17 (cjs).
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (cjs)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with I.C. Section 47-611 filed by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd.. Replies due by 11/1/2017.(Olson, Wendy)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim,, by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd..(Olson, Wendy)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and, COUNTERCLAIM of Battery Mineral Resources, Inc. against Arizona Lithium Company Ltd. by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Barker, Albert)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with I.C. Section 47-611 Albert P Barker appearing for Defendant Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. Responses due by 10/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with I.C. Section 47-611)(Barker, Albert)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. The joint stipulation (dkt. #10 ) is hereby approved. Defendant will have until September 27, 2017, to file an answer or responsive pleading. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION re #9 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines,,, for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. (Barker, Albert)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER WITHDRAWING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENTSERVICE OF PROCESS AND SETTING DATE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING granting #8 Stipulation. Defendants #5 Motion to Dismiss is hereby WITHDRAWN and its deadline to file an answer or responsive pleading shall by 9/25/2017. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Setting Date for Responsive Pleading by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. (Barker, Albert)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Courtney, Anna)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Lithium Company Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent 1954473 Alberta Ltd for Arizona Lithium Company Ltd... (Courtney, Anna)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WITHDRAWN - MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process Albert P Barker appearing for Defendant Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. Responses due by 9/26/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Henry Sandri)(Barker, Albert) Modified on 9/7/2017 to edit text for Attachment #1 (cjs). Modified on 9/14/2017 to Withdraw pursuant to Order Dkt. #9 (cjs).
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Arizona Lithium Company Ltd., Battery Mineral Resources, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/30/2017. (cjs)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Battery Mineral Resources, Inc. served on 8/28/2017. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (cjs)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. (Barker, Albert)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. (Barker, Albert)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc. from Lemhi District Court, case number CV-2017-182.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1627817.), filed by Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint - part 1 of 3, #3 Complaint - part 2 of 3, #4 Complaint - part 3 of 3, #5 Summons)(Barker, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Lithium Company Ltd. et al v. North American Cobalt Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Lithium Company Ltd.
Represented By: Anna E Courtney
Represented By: Richard R. Hall
Represented By: Megan A Olmstead
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Metals Corp
Represented By: Anna E Courtney
Represented By: Megan A Olmstead
Represented By: Richard R. Hall
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Cobalt Corp
Represented By: Anna E Courtney
Represented By: Megan A Olmstead
Represented By: Richard R. Hall
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battery Mineral Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Cobalt Inc
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: Jonas Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?