Nacki v. Coby et al
Petitioner: Mary Nacki
Respondent: Marcus Coby and Peter D McDermott
Case Number: 4:2018cv00392
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 The Clerk's Office closed this case pursuant to #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cjs)
September 22, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary Nacki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katsilometes, Thomas) Modified on 9/25/2018 (cjs).
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mary Nacki. Amendment to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, First Amended Petition. (Katsilometes, Thomas) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/11/2018) (cjs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G & G1, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R) (cjs). Modified on 9/11/2018 to separate exhibits from the main document (cjs).
September 7, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:18-cv-392-DCN (jp)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER and Order of Reassignment- This case shall be reassigned to the Honorable David C. Nye, based on that Court's calendar availability. Petitioner shall file the supplement required above as soon as reasonablypossible. A courtesy copy of this Order shall be sent to the Attorney for the Shoshone- Bannock Tribe, P.O. Box 306, Fort Hall, ID 83203. No formal action by Respondents is necessary at this time. Failure to take further action in this case will result in dismissal of the entire action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Release of Mary Nacki ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0976-1781258.), filed by Mary Nacki. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J Katsilometes In Support of)(Katsilometes, Thomas) Modified on 9/6/2018 (cjs). Modified on 9/6/2018 to reflect Exhibit 1 to the Declaration on Disk received and lodged in Clerk's Office file room (cjs). Modified on 9/10/2018 to reflect Amended Exhibit 1 on Disk received 9/7 and lodged in Clerk's Office file room (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nacki v. Coby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mary Nacki
Represented By: Thomas J Katsilometes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marcus Coby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter D McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?