Kam v. Trust Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matt Kam
Defendant: Trust Financial, LLC and Wilkerson & Bremer Law Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00421
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Blythe H Chandler for Matt Kam; approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Beth E Terrell for Matt Kam; approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Paul Arons for Matt Kam. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Paul Arons. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1815636.)Ryan Adam Ballard appearing for Plaintiff Matt Kam. Responses due by 12/17/2018 (Ballard, Ryan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Beth Terrell. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1815558.)Ryan Adam Ballard appearing for Plaintiff Matt Kam. Responses due by 12/17/2018 (Ballard, Ryan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Blythe Chandler. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1815555.)Ryan Adam Ballard appearing for Plaintiff Matt Kam. Responses due by 12/17/2018 (Ballard, Ryan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trust Financial, LLC, Wilkerson & Bremer Law Group, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Wilkerson & Bremer Law Group, LLC)(cjs)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1793752.), filed by Matt Kam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Ballard, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kam v. Trust Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkerson & Bremer Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Kam
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Represented By: Paul Arons
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Blythe H Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?