BuildItUSA.com LLC et al v. Build It USA Idaho LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mark Adams, BuildItUSA.com, Build River City USA, LLP and BuildItUSA.com LLC
Defendant: Mike Dolan, River City Roofing, LLC, Build It USA Idaho LLC, Stacy Dolan and Does 1 - 10
Case Number: 4:2018cv00454
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Mark Adams, Build River City USA, LLP, BuildItUSA.com LLC re #16 Amended Complaint Notice of Dismissal of Count 3 and 4 of the Amended Complaint (Johnson, Wyatt)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Johnson, Wyatt)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKETENTRY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 17, 2018. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (js)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Heather A Cunningham appearing for Defendants Build It USA Idaho LLC, Mike Dolan, Stacy Dolan, River City Roofing, LLC. Responses due by 12/6/2018 (Cunningham, Heather)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by River City Roofing, LLC. (Cunningham, Heather)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A Cunningham on behalf of River City Roofing, LLC (Cunningham, Heather)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BuildItUSA.com LLC, Build River City USA, LLP, Mark Adams. Stacy Dolan served on 11/11/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Johnson, Wyatt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BuildItUSA.com LLC, Build River City USA, LLP, Mark Adams. Mike Dolan served on 11/11/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Johnson, Wyatt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BuildItUSA.com LLC, Build River City USA, LLP, Mark Adams. River City Roofing, LLC served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (Johnson, Wyatt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BuildItUSA.com LLC, Build River City USA, LLP, Mark Adams. Build It USA Idaho LLC served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (Johnson, Wyatt)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Build It USA Idaho LLC. (Cunningham, Heather)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mark Adams, Build River City USA, LLP, BuildItUSA.com LLC. (Johnson, Wyatt)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Mark Adams, Build It USA Idaho LLC, Build River City USA, LLP, BuildItUSA.com LLC re #4 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/6/2019. (cjs)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A Cunningham on behalf of Build It USA Idaho LLC (Cunningham, Heather)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark number(s) Unknown Numbers (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 10/17/2018) (cjs)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Build It USA Idaho LLC, Mike Dolan, Stacy Dolan, River City Roofing, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - River City Roofing, LLC, #2 Summons Issued - Mike Dolan, #3 Summons Issued - Stacy Dolan)(cjs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1800033.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil, #2 Summons Build It USA Idaho, LLC, #3 Summons River City Roofing LLC, #4 Summons Mike Dolan, #5 Summons Stacy Dolan)(Johnson, Wyatt) Modified on 10/18/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BuildItUSA.com LLC et al v. Build It USA Idaho LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Dolan
Represented By: Heather A Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River City Roofing, LLC
Represented By: Heather A Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Build It USA Idaho LLC
Represented By: Heather A Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Dolan
Represented By: Heather A Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Adams
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BuildItUSA.com
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Build River City USA, LLP
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BuildItUSA.com LLC
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?