United States of America v. Adam Keith Tucker Farms, LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Adam Keith Tucker Farms, LLC, Thresher Artisan Wheat, JR Simplot Co, Adam Keith Tucker, Fall River Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Company and State of Idaho Department of Health and Welfare
Case Number: 4:2018cv00459
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Thresher Artisan Wheat served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Woychick, Nicholas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Fall River Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Woychick, Nicholas)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. JR Simplot Co waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Woychick, Nicholas)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Idaho Department of Health and Welfare waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Woychick, Nicholas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Adam Keith Tucker Farms, LLC, Fall River Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., JR Simplot Co, State of Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, Thresher Artisan Wheat, Adam Keith Tucker. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(jp)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons)(Woychick, Nicholas)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adam Keith Tucker Farms, LLC, Fall River Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., JR Simplot Co, Thresher Artisan Wheat, Adam Keith Tucker. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(jp)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Cover Sheet, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons)(Woychick, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Adam Keith Tucker Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Keith Tucker Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thresher Artisan Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Simplot Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Keith Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fall River Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho Department of Health and Welfare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicholas J Woychick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?