United States of America v. Sweers et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Rebecca D. Sweers, Lewiston State Bank and Leslie R. Sweers, IV
Case Number: 4:2018cv00481
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Rebecca D. Sweers waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Woychick, Nicholas)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Leslie R. Sweers, IV waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Woychick, Nicholas)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, Notice of Partial Dismissal (Lewiston State Bank) (Woychick, Nicholas)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLAIMER by Plaintiff United States of America. (Woychick, Nicholas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lewiston State Bank, Leslie R. Sweers, IV, Rebecca D. Sweers. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Rebecca D. Sweers, #2 Summons Issued - Lewiston State Bank)(cjs)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Leslie R. Sweers, IV, #6 Summons Rebecca D. Sweers, #7 Summons Lewiston State Bank)(Woychick, Nicholas) Modified on 10/31/2018 (cjs)..

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sweers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca D. Sweers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewiston State Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie R. Sweers, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Nicholas J Woychick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?