Affinity Partnerships, LLC v. Usrealty.com, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Affinity Partnerships and Affinity Partnerships, LLC
Defendant: USREALTY.COM, LLP and USREALTY.COM, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00501
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Benjamin Stallings Coltrin for Affinity Partnerships, LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Usrealty.com, LLC, Usrealty.com, LLP. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Usrealty.com, LLP)(cjs)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Reed Larsen. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1811317.)Reed W Larsen appearing for Plaintiff Affinity Partnerships. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Supplement letter to Idaho State Bar)(Larsen, Reed)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury against All Defendants, filed by Affinity Partnerships. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Larsen, Reed) Modified on 11/28/2018 (cjs).
November 13, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Affinity Partnerships was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party did not include a cover sheet as an attachment to the Complaint. Please submit the cover sheet using the cover sheet event, located under Other Filings, Other Documents, and link the docket entry to docket no. 1. (km)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1810281.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Larsen, Reed) Modified on 11/28/2018 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affinity Partnerships, LLC v. Usrealty.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USREALTY.COM, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USREALTY.COM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affinity Partnerships
Represented By: Reed W Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affinity Partnerships, LLC
Represented By: Reed W Larsen
Represented By: Benjamin Stallings Coltrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?