Schmitt et al v. RMC LaMar Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Schmitt, Jessie Blake, Shawn Schmitt, Michael Schmitt and Jamie Schmitt
Defendant: Dragon Products, LLC, RMC LaMar Holdings, Inc., Dragon Products, Does I through X and The Modern Group, LTD
Case Number: 4:2018cv00558
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Stipulation of Dismissal - the Court hereby DISMISSES Defendant RMC LaMar Holdings, Inc. as a party in this case WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stiplation to Dismiss Defendant RMC LaMar Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Ranco and Ranco Trailers by RMC LaMar Holdings, Inc.. (Mollerup, Bren)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. On or before 3/4/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by RMC LaMar Holdings, Inc..(Mollerup, Bren)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Dragon Products, Dragon Products, LLC, The Modern Group, LTD.(Mollerup, Bren)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jessie Blake, Dragon Products, Dragon Products, LLC, Alicia Schmitt, Jamie Schmitt, Michael Schmitt, Shawn Schmitt, The Modern Group, LTD re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/17/2019. (cjs)
December 19, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (cjs)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dragon Products. (Mollerup, Bren)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dragon Products, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Modern Group, Ltd. for Dragon Products, LLC.. (Mollerup, Bren)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Modern Group, LTD. (Mollerup, Bren)
December 19, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal.No action is needed by the filing party at this time as the Clerk's Office will split the state court documents from the main document.(cjs)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial District, case number CV10-18-6124.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1825883.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Mollerup, Bren) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/19/2018) (cjs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2018: #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Service Documents - Exhibit B, #4 State Court Service Documents - Exhibit C, #5 State Court Service Documents - Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Docket Sheet) (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmitt et al v. RMC LaMar Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Schmitt
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael R McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Blake
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael R McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Schmitt
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael R McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schmitt
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael R McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Schmitt
Represented By: Jarom A Whitehead
Represented By: Michael R McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragon Products, LLC
Represented By: Michael Danielson
Represented By: Bren Erik Mollerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC LaMar Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Bren Erik Mollerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragon Products
Represented By: Michael Danielson
Represented By: Bren Erik Mollerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Modern Group, LTD
Represented By: Michael Danielson
Represented By: Bren Erik Mollerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?