Cairns v. Idaho Falls School District No. 91
Plaintiff: William Cairns
Defendant: Idaho Falls School District No. 91
Case Number: 4:2018cv00564
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Motion for Protective Order by William Cairns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Casperson, DeAnne)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 7/26/2019. Discovery due by 12/27/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2020. ADR must take place by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due 4/19/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Due to Request for Reassignment to District Judge and Reassignment of Case, Dkt. 14, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale is hereby VACATED. (at)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Idaho Falls School District No. 91. (Julian, Brian)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 DISCOVERY PLAN by William Cairns Stipulated Discovery Plan. (Casperson, DeAnne)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by William Cairns. (Casperson, DeAnne)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:18-cv-564-BLW(jp)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Idaho Falls School District No. 91.(Julian, Brian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/28/2019 02:30 PM is hereby RESCHEDULED to begin at 11:00 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 3/21/2019. (same date as previously scheduled, new time) (at)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K Julian on behalf of Idaho Falls School District No. 91 (Julian, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/5/2019 10:30 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 3/28/2019 02:30 PM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 3/21/2019. (at)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by William Cairns. (Casperson, DeAnne)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/28/2019 11:00 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 3/5/2019 10:30 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 2/26/2019. (at)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT on Process of Service by William Cairns. (Casperson, DeAnne)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2019 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 2/21/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Idaho Falls School District No. 91. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Idaho Falls School District No. 91 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1827305.), filed by William Cairns. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Casperson, DeAnne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cairns v. Idaho Falls School District No. 91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Falls School District No. 91
Represented By: Scott W Marotz
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cairns
Represented By: Ryan S. Dustin
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?