United States of America v. Real Property Located at 995 Homer Ave., Idaho Falls, ID

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 995 Homer Ave., Idaho Falls, ID
Case Number: 4:2019cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Good cause appearing, #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay is GRANTED. This action is hereby stayed until completion of the sentencing of criminal defendant Stanley Gallegos in case 4:18-cr-110-DCN, which is currently set for March 25, 2019. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a status report or other filing in this matter within 14 days after such sentencing. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (kcs)
January 31, 2019 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00006-REB for all future filings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to this case. (km)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay Kevin T Maloney appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 1/31/2019 (Maloney, Kevin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint In Rem against Real Property Located at 995 Homer Ave., Idaho Falls, ID, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Sheet)(Maloney, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 995 Homer Ave., Idaho Falls, ID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 995 Homer Ave., Idaho Falls, ID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin T Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?